EP1015511 - HIGH INTERNAL PHASE RATIO EMULSIONS AND STABLE AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF HYDROXY-FUNCTIONAL POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIECHOCKI, Christian 20, rue du Prieur Hoffer F-67500 Marienthal / FR | 02 /
PATE, James, E. 933 West Walter Road Sanford, MI 48657 / US | 03 /
MANG, Michael, N. 3708 Haskin Drive Midland, MI 48640 / US | 04 /
SCHMIDT, Dale, C. 5301 Swede Avenue Midland, MI 48642 / US | 05 /
WHITE, Jerry, E. 418 Huckeberry Drive Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98941068.3 | 26.08.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US17694 | Priority number, date | US19970058067P | 05.09.1997 Original published format: US 58067 P | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9912995 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1015511 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1015511 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/03, C08J3/07 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
C08J3/07 (EP,US);
C08J3/03 (KR);
C08G59/066 (EP,US);
C08G59/12 (EP,US);
C08L71/00 (EP,US);
C08J2371/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L71/00, C08L71/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | EMULSIONEN MIT GROSSER INNERER PHASE UND STABILE DISPERSIONEN AUF BASIS VON HYDROXYFUNKTIONELLEN POLYMEREN | [2000/27] | English: | HIGH INTERNAL PHASE RATIO EMULSIONS AND STABLE AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF HYDROXY-FUNCTIONAL POLYMERS | [2000/27] | French: | EMULSIONS A RAPPORT DE PHASES INTERNES ELEVE ET DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES STABLES DE POLYMERES HYDROXY-FONCTIONNELS | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 17.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US5171820 (MANG MICHAEL N [US], et al) [DY] 1-18 * claim - *; | [DY]US5275853 (SILVIS H CRAIG [US], et al) [DY] 1-18* claim - *; | [DY]US5496910 (MANG MICHAEL N [US], et al) [DY] 1-18 * claim - *; | [Y]WO9639461 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1-18 *The whole document* |