EP1093695 - INITIALIZATION OF HANDSETS IN A MULTI-LINE WIRELESS PHONE SYSTEM FOR SECURE COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMASWAMY, Kumar 9417 College Drive B Indianapolis, IN 46240 / US | 02 /
KNUTSON, Paul, Gothard 148 South Emerson Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46219 / US | 03 /
KAPADIA, Maneck, Behram 538 Arbor Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/35] | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Etienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2001/17] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 98941108.7 | 01.09.1998 | [2001/17] | WO1998US18059 | Priority number, date | US19970069684P | 12.12.1997 Original published format: US 69684 P | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9931859 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093695 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1093695 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/72 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
H04M1/727 (EP);
H04B7/212 (KR);
H04M1/66 (EP);
H04M1/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/17] | Title | German: | INITIALISIERUNG EINES HANDAPPARAT FÜR EIN SICHERES SCHNURLOSES TELEFONSYSTEM MIT MEHREREN LEITUNGEN | [2001/17] | English: | INITIALIZATION OF HANDSETS IN A MULTI-LINE WIRELESS PHONE SYSTEM FOR SECURE COMMUNICATIONS | [2001/17] | French: | PROTECTION DES COMMUNICATIONS DANS UN RESEAU MULTILIGNE DE TELEPHONIE SANS FIL PAR INITIALISATION DES COMBINES | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 31.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0301573 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 6,7 * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 3 *; | [XAY]EP0304998 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,8,10 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 3 * * column 4, lines 5-10; figure 1 * * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 49; figure 5 * * column 6, lines 18-22 * [A] 9 [Y] 2,3,11,12; | [A]US5371783 (ROSE CHRIS [CA], et al) [A] 1,5,8,11,12 * abstract * * column 3, lines 13-17 ** column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 57 *; | [Y]US5495520 (KOJIMA SUSUMU [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * column 2, lines 5-54 *; | [YA]US5625888 (RUETHER RALF [DE], et al) [Y] 11,12 * column 2, lines 10-41; claim 1 * [A] 4 |