EP1007775 - LONG FIBER-FOAM COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Möller Plast GmbH Kupferhammer 33649 Bielefeld / DE | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESCH, Rolf Steinkamp 2 c D-32657 Lemgo / DE | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Schirmer, Siegfried Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Detmolderstrasse 235 33605 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Schirmer, Siegfried Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Detmolderstrasse 235 33605 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | Schirmer, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. Boehmert & Boehmert, Patentanwalt, Osningstrasse 10 33605 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 98941244.0 | 29.06.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998DE01777 | Priority number, date | DE1997137014 | 26.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19737014 | [2000/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9910581 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007775 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007775 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/68 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
D04H1/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/24] | Title | German: | LANGFASER-SCHAUMVERBUND | [2000/24] | English: | LONG FIBER-FOAM COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2000/24] | French: | COMPOSITE MOUSSE-FIBRES LONGUES | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1685180 (HEINRICH HAEUSSLING FA) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1947142 (WTZ FEIKERAMISCHEN IND) [A] 1,8-11 * page 3, paragraph 1; claim - *; | [X]WO9307318 (SCANWOVEN AB OY [FI]) [X] 1,2,4,5,15 * page 6 - page 7; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0657266 (GREINER & SOEHNE C A [AT]) [A] 12,13; | [A]JPH0428534 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920512), vol. 016, no. 195, Database accession no. (M - 1246), & JP04028534 A 19920131 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |