EP1007815 - DOOR DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE | ||
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states GEZE GmbH Siemensstrasse 21-29 D-7250 Leonberg / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states GEZE Grundstücks- und Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH Siemens Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEUCHT, Rudi Talstrasse 17 D-71287 Weissach / DE | 02 /
HALA, Ralf An der Säge 12 D-88161 Lindenberg / DE | 03 /
KÄSER, Uwe Hintere Strasse 26 D-75446 Wiernsheim / DE | 04 /
REUFF, Theo Schumannstrasse 12 D-71065 Sindelfingen / DE | [2000/24] | Application number, filing date | 98941255.6 | 30.06.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998DE01795 | Priority number, date | DE1997133392 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19733392 | DE1998122498 | 19.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19822498 | [2000/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906659 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007815 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007815 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05F3/22 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
E05F3/10 (EP,US);
E05F3/227 (EP,US);
E05F2003/228 (EP,US);
E05F2015/631 (EP,US);
E05F3/102 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/11 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/40 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/12 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/29 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Extension states | SI | 09.02.2000 | Title | German: | TÜRANTRIEB | [2000/24] | English: | DOOR DRIVE SYSTEM | [2000/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE PORTE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 06.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 16.08.2001 | GR | 17.08.2001 | [2004/51] |
Former [2002/27] | PT | 16.08.2001 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4847946 (NAM SUN O [KR], et al) [Y] 6,13* figures 4-6 *; | [Y]US5121686 (SCHONLAU JUERGEN [DE], et al) [Y] 2,5 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 6, line 28 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE4124282 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [DXAY]DE19529168 (SCHLAGE LOCK CO [US]) [DX] 1,3-5,7,15,17,18,21-27 * claims 2,4,6,8-11 * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 43 - line 48 * * column 3, line 27 - line 42 * * column 4, line 6 - line 20; figures 2-5 * [A] 16,19,20 [Y] 1,2,5,6,13 | by applicant | DE3638353 | EP0328912 | DE19529168 |