EP1019323 - COMPOSITION BASED ON SAMARIUM SESQUISULPHIDE, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE AS COLOURING PIGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSNOT, Sylvain 7, chemin de la Borne aux Loups F-60157 Elincourt Sainte Marguerite / FR | 02 /
MACAUDIERE, Pierre 9, rue de l'Eglise F-92600 Asnières-sur-Seine / FR | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Dubruc, Philippe, et al Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Dubruc, Philippe, et al RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98941573.2 | 07.08.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998FR01775 | Priority number, date | FR19970010229 | 08.08.1997 Original published format: FR 9710229 | [2000/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9907639 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019323 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019323 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C01F17/00, C08K3/30, C09D7/12 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
C08K3/30 (EP,US);
C01F17/38 (EP,US);
C09C1/00 (EP,US);
C09C3/063 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF BASIS VON SAMARIUMSESQUISULFID, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG ALS FARBPIGMENT | [2000/29] | English: | COMPOSITION BASED ON SAMARIUM SESQUISULPHIDE, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE AS COLOURING PIGMENT | [2000/29] | French: | COMPOSITION A BASE D'UN SESQUISULFURE DE SAMARIUM, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET UTILISATION COMME PIGMENT COLORANT | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 29.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.08.2003 | FI | 07.08.2003 | IE | 07.08.2003 | ES | 08.08.2003 | BE | 31.08.2003 | DK | 01.09.2003 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/02] | CY | 07.08.2003 | |
FI | 07.08.2003 | ||
IE | 07.08.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2003 | ||
DK | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CY | 07.08.2003 | |
FI | 07.08.2003 | ||
IE | 07.08.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | CY | 07.08.2003 | |
FI | 07.08.2003 | ||
IE | 07.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | CY | 07.08.2003 | |
FI | 07.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 07.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2139620 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE); | [A]EP0203838 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]); | [XY]EP0545746 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]); | [XY]EP0680930 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]); | [Y]WO9711031 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR], et al); |