EP1007541 - RANDOMLY GENERATED GLYCOPEPTIDE COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOMIRA, INC. Edmonton Research Park, 2011 94th Street Edmonton Alberta T6N 1H1 / CA | [2006/34] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states BIOMIRA, INC. Edmonton Research Park, 2011 94th Street Edmonton, Alberta T6N 1H1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOGANTY, Rao, R. 11605-26 Avenue Edmonton, Alberta T6J 3R3 / CA | 02 /
QIU, Dongxu 1451 Jeffreys Crescent Edmonton, Alberta T6L 6T3 / CA | 03 /
GANDHI, Sham 2018-46 Street Edmonton, Alberta T6L 2T5 / CA | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Maschio, Antonio, et al D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98941652.4 | 28.08.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998IB01469 | Priority number, date | US19970056240P | 28.08.1997 Original published format: US 56240 P | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911654 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007541 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007541 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/04, C07K14/47, G01N33/68 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
C07K1/047 (EP,US);
C07K14/4727 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | ZUFÄLLIGVERTEILT ERZEUGTE KOMBINATORISCHE PEPTIDBIBLIOTHEKEN | [2000/24] | English: | RANDOMLY GENERATED GLYCOPEPTIDE COMBINATORIAL LIBRARIES | [2000/24] | French: | BANQUES COMBINATOIRES DE GLYCOPEPTIDES GENERES DE MANIERE ALEATOIRE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.09.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | BE | 23.08.2006 | CH | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | IT | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | LU | 28.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
LU | 28.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9510296 (GLYCOMED INC [US]) [X] 32,34-37 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9518971 (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL], et al) [X] 32,34-37 * the whole document *; | [XP] - A SCHLEYER ET AL., "Direct solid-phase glycosylations of peptide templates on a novel PEG-based resin", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION., WEINHEIM DE, (19971002), vol. 36, no. 18, pages 1976 - 1978, XP002092747 [XP] 32,34-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.199719761 | [X] - K FRISCHE ET AL., "Multiple column synthesis of a library of T-cell stimulating Tn-antigenic glycopeptide analogs for the molecular characterization of T-cell glycan specificity", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19961118), vol. 125, no. 21, Database accession no. 276512, XP002092749 [X] 32,34-37 | [ ] - J. PEPT. SCI., (1996), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 212 - 222 [ ] * abstract * | [A] - File Medline, abstract 96121420, 1996, XP002092748 [A] 1-41 | [ ] - X LIU ET AL., "Structurally defined syntetic cancer vaccines; analysis of the structure, glycosylation and recognition of cancer associated mucin, MUC-1 derived peptides", GLYCOCONJUGATE JOURNAL, (199510), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 607 - 617 [ ] * abstract * |