Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010052060 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9817227 | 19.08.1998 | US91473597 | 19.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001514917 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9817227 | 19.08.1998 | US91473597 | 19.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9025498 | Global Dossier | 08.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9817227 | 19.08.1998 | US91473597 | 19.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1011443 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2001 | A4 | EP1011443 | 28.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9817227 | 19.08.1998 | US91473597 | 19.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9811977 | 02.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9817227 | 19.08.1998 | US91473597 | 19.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2301914 | 25.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9817227 | 19.08.1998 | US91473597 | 19.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5928708 | 27.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US3562597 | 21.01.1997 | US3071796 | 08.11.1996 | US91473597 | 19.08.1997 | US2609896 | 13.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6030655 | 29.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US3562597 | 21.01.1997 | US3071796 | 08.11.1996 | US91473597 | 19.08.1997 | US2609896 | 13.09.1996 | US32507499 | 03.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9908595 | Global Dossier | 25.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91473597 | 19.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1273515 | 15.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US91473597 | 19.08.1997 |