EP1011443 - POSITIVE IDENTIFICATION AND PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS USING INKLESS FINGERPRINT METHODOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hansmire, Kenny 2309 Balsom Drive No. K210 Arlington, TX 76006 / US | For all designated states Pyhrr, Peter 1310 Meadow Green Duncanville, TX 75137 / US | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belmont House, 20 Wood Lane Leeds LS6 2AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98942136.7 | 19.08.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US17227 | Priority number, date | US19970914735 | 19.08.1997 Original published format: US 914735 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908595 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1011443 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/117, B41M3/14, B41M5/132, B05D5/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
B41M3/142 (EP,US);
B41M7/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | POSITIVE IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND SCHUTZ VON DOKUMENTEN DURCH EIN TINTENLOSES FINGERABDRUCKVERFAHREN | [2000/26] | English: | POSITIVE IDENTIFICATION AND PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS USING INKLESS FINGERPRINT METHODOLOGY | [2000/26] | French: | IDENTIFICATION ET PROTECTION INFAILLIBLES DE DOCUMENTS UTILISANT UNE METHODOLOGIE D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES SANS ENCRE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.03.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 12.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/36] | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/36] | Request for further processing for: | 21.09.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.11.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3851619 (COFIELD E, et al) [X] 8-13 * column 2, line 55 - line 62 * * column 3, line 7 - line 10 * * column 5, line 9 - line 15 * * column 10, line 19 - line 28; figure 3 * [Y] 2,4,6,14-16; | [XY]GB1507454 (WIGGINS TEAPE LTD) [X] 1,3,5,7 * page 1, line 9 - line 13 * * page 5, line 27 - line 35; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2,4,6,14-16; | [X]US4705299 (HEDGCOTH VIRGIL [US], et al) [X] 8-13* column 1, line 54 - line 64; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]US2538784 (KANTROWITZ MORRIS S, et al); | [A]US5009919 (VASSILIADES ANTHONY E [US]); | [X]US5087283 (DIXON MARVIN P [US], et al) |