EP1012302 - HUMAN NUCLEOTIDE PYROPHOSPHOHYDROLASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 3174 Porter Drive Palo Alto CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 3174 Porter Drive Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITCHELL, Peter, G. 5 Godfrey Street Mystic, CT 06355 / US | 02 /
HUTCHINSON, Nancy 7 Squire Hill Old Lyme, CT 06371 / US | 03 /
LAWTON, Michael 61 Magna Lane Westbrook, CT 06498 / US | 04 /
MAGNA, Holly 88 Old Black Point Road Niantic, CT 06357 / US | 05 /
YOCUM, Sue, A. 11 Pinecrest Lane Baltic, CT 06330 / US | 06 /
MURRY, Lynn, E. 1124 Los Trancos Road Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Wright, Simon Mark, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Wright, Simon Mark, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98942244.9 | 26.08.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US17648 | Priority number, date | US19970918914 | 27.08.1997 Original published format: US 918914 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9910502 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012302 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, C12N9/16, A61K38/46, C07K16/40, C12N15/11, A61K31/70, A61K39/395, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/26] | Title | German: | MENSCHLICHE NUKLEOTID-PYROPHOSPHOHYDROLASE | [2000/26] | English: | HUMAN NUCLEOTIDE PYROPHOSPHOHYDROLASE | [2000/26] | French: | NUCLEOTIDE PYROPHOSPHOHYDROLASE HUMAIN | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 13.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.05.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA] - MASUDA I. ET AL., "A unique ectonucleotide pyrophosphohydrolase associated with porcine chondrocyte-derived vesicles", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (199502), vol. 95, no. 2, pages 699 - 704, XP002087593 [X] 1-6,9-13,15-17,19-21 * page 701, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 702, column L, paragraph 4; table II * * page 703, column R; figure 4 * [A] 7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI117716 | [XD] - Database EMBL Emest11; Entry HSA39396 Accession number AA039396 31 August 1996 98% identity with Seq.ID:2 nt.52-197, XP002086985 [XD] 3-8 * the whole document * | [XD] - Database EMBL Emest14; Entry HSZZ67967 Accession number AA362841 18 April 1997 99% identity with Seq.ID:2 nt.1459-1768, XP002086986 [XD] 3-8 * the whole document * | [XD] - Database EMBL Emest13; Entry HSPD00761 Accession number F16275 20 December 1995 97% identity with Seq.ID:2 nt.3619-3894, XP002086987 [XD] 3-8 * the whole document * | [XD] - CARDENAL A. ET AL., "Identification of a nucleotide pyrophosphohydrolase from articular tissues in human serum", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, (199602), vol. 39, no. 2, pages 252 - 256, XP002087594 [XD] 1,2,12,13,15-17,21 * page 252 * * page 253, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 254; figure 1 * * page 255, column L, paragraph 4 - page 256, column L * | [AD] - PARK W. ET AL., "Inorganic pyrophosphate generation from adenosine triphosphate by cell-free human synovial fluid", THE JOURNAL OF RHEUMATOLOGY, (199604), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 665 - 671, XP002087595 [AD] 15-17 * page 670, column R, paragraph 2 - page 671 * | [PX] - MASUDA I. ET AL., "Molecular cloning and expression of a porcine chondrocyte nucleotide pyrophosphohydrolase", GENE: AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON GENES AND GENOMES, (19970915), vol. 197, no. 1-2, page 277-287, XP004126428 [PX] 5,7,8,11,13,15-17,19-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(97)00272-2 | [T] - LORENZO P. ET AL., "Cloning and deduced amino acid sequence of a novel cartilage protein (CILP) identifies a proform including a nucleotide pyrophosphohydrolase", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (199809), vol. 36, no. 4, pages 23469 - 23475, XP002086984 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.36.23469 |