EP1000503 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK MANAGEMENT AND DISPLAY OF MARKET-PRICE INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anip, Inc. 502 East John Street Carson City, NV 89706 / US | [2002/27] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Mashinsky, Alexander Apt. 8H, 495 West End Avenue New York, NY 10023 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 98942297.7 | 28.08.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998US17923 | Priority number, date | US19970920567 | 29.08.1997 Original published format: US 920567 | US19970927443 | 11.09.1997 Original published format: US 927443 | US19980129413 | 05.08.1998 Original published format: US 129413 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911051 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000503 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/00, G02B21/00, H04Q3/66, H04L12/24, G06F17/60, G01B7/34 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
H04Q3/0062 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/46 (EP,US);
H04M15/49 (EP,US);
H04M15/51 (EP,US);
H04M15/8044 (EP,US);
H04M15/805 (EP,US);
H04Q3/66 (EP,US);
H04M2215/42 (EP,US);
H04M2215/46 (EP,US);
H04M2215/54 (EP,US);
H04M2215/56 (EP,US);
H04M2215/745 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7457 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1313 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/20] | H04M15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES GLOBALKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKES UND ZUM ANZEIGEN VON MARKTPREIS INFORMATIONEN | [2000/20] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GLOBAL COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK MANAGEMENT AND DISPLAY OF MARKET-PRICE INFORMATION | [2000/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE GESTION DE RESEAU MONDIAL DE COMMUNICATIONS ET D'AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS DE PRIX DU MARCHE | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 14.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/46] | 31.03.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.05.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/46] | Appeal following examination | 02.06.2006 | Appeal received No. T1450/06 | 08.08.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.05.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 07.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP05022428.6 / EP1633124 | Request for further processing for: | 20.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.05.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2002 | 31.08.2009 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0501903 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-41 * column 4, line 22 - column 6, line 25; figure 2 *; | [X]WO9428683 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [X] 1-41 * page 5, line 26 - page 11, line 27 *; | [X]DE19516364 (MITEL CORP [CA]) [X] 1-41 * column 3, line 12 - column 8, line 36; figures 4A-4C *; | [X]WO9705749 (CALL MANAGE LTD [IL], et al) [X] 26 * page 15, line 1 - page 23, line 17 *; | [A]WO9710560 (CYBERMARK L L C [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XP]US5675636 (GRAY THOMAS A [CA]) [XP] 1-41 * column 3, line 24 - column 6, line 33; figures 4A-4C *; | [PA]US5781620 (MONTGOMERY ROBERT H [US], et al) [PA] 1-41 * abstract *; | [PA]WO9832289 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) [PA] 26 * abstract *; | [AP]US5794207 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al) [AP] 1* column 10, line 1 - line 7 *; | [PA]EP0858231 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [PA] 1,8,12,22 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 23; figure 2 *; | [X] - DOORENBOS R B ET AL, "A SCALABLE COMPARISON-SHOPPING AGENT FOR THE WORLD-WIDE WEB", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUTONOMOUS AGENTS MARINA DEL REY, CA., FEB. 5 - 8, 1997, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUTONOMOUS AGENTS, NEW YORK, ACM, US, (1997), vol. CONF. 1, ISBN 0-89791-877-0, pages 39 - 48, XP000915342 [X] 26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/267658.267666 | International search | [Y]US4594477 (NOIROT TAMARRA J [US]); | [Y]WO9201350 (TELLER DAVID M [US]); | [Y]US5163042 (OCHIAI TAMIYA [JP]); | [Y]WO9428683 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]); | [Y]US5606602 (JOHNSON JACK J [US], et al); | [Y]US5608786 (GORDON ALASTAIR T [CA]); | [YP]US5706507 (SCHLOSS ROBERT JEFFREY [US]); | [YP]US5790642 (TAYLOR JOHN [US], et al) |