EP1011319 - A METHOD OF TREATMENT AND AN ANIMAL MODEL USEFUL FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WALTER AND ELIZA HALL INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH Royal Parade Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states THE WALTER AND ELIZA HALL INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH Royal Parade Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORY, Suzanne 57 Brougham Street North Melbourne, VIC 3051 / AU | 02 /
ADAMS, Jerry 57 Brougham Street North Melbourne, VIC 3051 / AU | 03 /
PRINT, Cris 46 Erskine Street North Melbourne, VIC 3051 / AU | 04 /
GIBSON, Leonie 13 Park Street Moonee Ponds, VIC 3039 / AU | 05 /
KOENTGEN, Frank 5 Timberglades Park Orchards, VIC 3114 / AU | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98942391.8 | 16.09.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998AU00764 | Priority number, date | AU1997PP09228 | 16.09.1997 Original published format: AU PP922897 | [2000/48] |
Former [2000/26] | AU1997PO09228T | 16.09.1997 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9913710 | Date: | 25.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1011319 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C12N15/12, C07K14/47 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K67/0276 (EP,US);
C07K14/4747 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/26] | A01K67/027, C12N15/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UND TIERMODELL GEEIGNET FÜR DERARTIGE VERFAHREN | [2000/26] | English: | A METHOD OF TREATMENT AND AN ANIMAL MODEL USEFUL FOR SAME | [2000/26] | French: | METHODE DE TRAITEMENT ET MODELE ANIMAL UTILE POUR LADITE METHODE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 17.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/32] | 20.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/32] | Request for further processing for: | 18.01.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9613614 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document, in particular pages 52-53 *; | [Y] - X. VILAGRASA ET AL.,, "Differential expression of bcl-2 and bcl-x during chicken spermatogenesis", MOL. REPROD. DEV., (199705), vol. 47, no. 1, pages 26 - 29, XP001037904 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1098-2795(199705)47:1<26::AID-MRD4>3.0.CO;2-S | [Y] - JF. CATTERALL ET AL.,, "Expression of the Bcl-2 family of cell death regulators during spermatogenesis", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ANDROLOGY, (1997), vol. 20, no. SUPPL. 1, page 60, XP001037908 [Y] 1-19 * VIth International Congress of Andrology, Salzburg, Austria. May 25-29, 1997 * abstract * | [Y] - C. MICHAEL KNUDSON ET AL.,, "Bax-deficient mice with lymphoid hyperplasia and male germ cell death", SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 96 - 97, XP001038036 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.270.5233.96 | [PX] - ROSS A, ET AL., "BCL-W IS ESSENTIAL FOR MURINE SPERMA TOGENESIS", GENE THER. MEETING COLD SPRING HARBOR., XX, XX, XX, (19970901), page 128, XP001037482 [PX] 1-19 * abstract * | [PX] - ROSS A, ET AL., "BCL-W IS ESSENTIAL FOR MURINE SPERMA TOGENESIS", GENE THER. MEETING COLD SPRING HARBOR., XX, XX, XX, (19970901), page 254, XP001037483 [PX] 1-19 * abstract * | [PX] - A.J. ROSS ET AL.,, "Testicular degeneration in Bclw-deficient mice", NATURE GENETICS, (199803), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 251 - 256, XP001037907 [PX] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng0398-251 | International search | [XP] - HSU S.Y. et al., "Bok is a Pro-Apoptolic Bcl-2 Protein with Restricted Expression in Reproductive Tissues and Heterodimerizes with Selective Anti-Apoptotic Bsl-2 Family Members", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), Volume 94, pages 12401-12406. | [X] - RODRIGUEZ I. et al., "An Early an Massive Wave of Genuinal Cell Apoptosis is Required for the Development of Functional Spermatogenesis", THE EMBO JOURNAL, (1997), Volume 16, No. 9, pages 2262-2270. | [XP] - MATSUI Y. et al., "Regulation of Germ Cell Death in Mammalian Gonads", APMIS, (1998), Volume 106, pages 142-148. | [X] - GIBSON L. et al., "Bcl-w, a Novel Member of the Bcl-2 Family, Promotes Cell Survival", ONCOGENE, (1996), Volume 13, pages 665-675. | [X] - FURUCHI T. et al., "Inhibition of Testicular Germ Cell Apoptosis and Differentiation in Mice Misexpressing Bcl-2 in Spermatogonia", DEVELOPMENT, (1996), Volume 122, pages 1703-1709. | [T] - ROSS A.J. et al., "Testicular Degeneration in Bclw-Deficient Mice", NATURE GENETICS, (1998), Volume 18(3), pages 251-256. | [T] - BRAUN R.E. et al., "Every Sperm is Sacred - or is it?", NATURE GENETICS, (1998), Volume 18(3), pages 202-204. |