Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001512083 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9804965 | 31.07.1998 | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9071898 | Global Dossier | 22.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9804965 | 31.07.1998 | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1007474 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2001 | B1 | EP1007474 | 14.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9804965 | 31.07.1998 | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE207035T | 15.11.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP9804965 | 31.07.1998 | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69802104T | 20.06.2002 | T2 | DE69802104D1 | 22.11.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9804965 | 31.07.1998 | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6413927 | 02.07.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP9804965 | 31.07.1998 | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9906321 | Global Dossier | 11.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100520385B | Global Dossier | 11.10.2005 | B1 | KR20010022515 | 15.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR016577 | 25.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2166186T | 01.04.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9716139D0 | 08.10.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA986832 | 31.01.2000 | B | Priority number | Date | GB9716139 | 01.08.1997 |