EP1022489 - VARIABLE CONTINUOUS TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garcia Benitez, Francisco de Asis Calle Monzon 42, 4o A 41012 Sevilla / ES | For all designated states Gutierrez de Cepeda, Juan Juan Sebastian Elcano 4 E-41011 Sevilla / ES | For all designated states Campillo Arrabal, Gonzalo Calle Ronda de Capuchinos, 4 41003 Sevilla / ES | For all designated states Madronal Martinez, Pedro Calle P. Capuchinos, 6D 11405 Jerez de la Frontera / ES | [2000/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/30] | Application number, filing date | 98942695.2 | 18.09.1998 | [2000/30] | WO1998ES00254 | Priority number, date | ES19970001972 | 19.09.1997 Original published format: ES 9701972 | [2000/30] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9915812 | Date: | 01.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022489 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022489 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16H29/16, F16H29/18, F16H37/08 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
F16H29/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/30] | F16H29/16, F16H29/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Title | German: | GETRIEBESYSTEM MIT KONTINUIERLICH VARIABLER ÜBERSETZUNG | [2000/30] | English: | VARIABLE CONTINUOUS TRANSMISSION SYSTEM | [2000/30] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION A RAPPORT CONTINU VARIABLE | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2000 | Translation filed | 12.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.04.2002 | BE | 10.04.2002 | CH | 10.04.2002 | FI | 10.04.2002 | GR | 10.04.2002 | LI | 10.04.2002 | NL | 10.04.2002 | DK | 10.07.2002 | PT | 10.07.2002 | SE | 10.07.2002 | IE | 18.09.2002 | LU | 18.09.2002 | CY | 30.09.2002 | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
BE | 10.04.2002 | ||
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 18.09.2002 | ||
LU | 18.09.2002 | ||
CY | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
BE | 10.04.2002 | ||
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 18.09.2002 | ||
CY | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
BE | 10.04.2002 | ||
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 18.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 18.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 18.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
PT | 10.07.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
GR | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
CH | 10.04.2002 | ||
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 10.04.2002 | |
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 10.04.2002 | |
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 10.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1847040 (ERICH ROTH); | [A]FR806831 ; | [A]GB465110 (EDOUARD GOURMAIN); | [A]US3087355 (JUSTIN BASSEREAU ROGER JULES); | [A]US4983151 (PIRES PAUL B [US]); | [A]WO9506829 (AIMBRIDGE PTY LTD [AU], et al) |