EP1012456 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING MEANS FOR RECIRCULATING EXHAUST AND TURBO BOOST GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drecq, Daniel 8, rue Octave Allaire 78610 Saint Léger en Yvelines / FR | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Abello, Michel Brema-Loyer 161, rue de Courcelles 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Abello, Michel Cabinet Peuscet, 78, avenue Raymond Poincaré 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98942834.7 | 07.09.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998FR01908 | Priority number, date | FR19970011294 | 11.09.1997 Original published format: FR 9711294 | [2000/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9913205 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012456 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02B27/00, F02M25/07 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
F02B27/00 (KR);
F02B27/06 (EP,US);
F02B37/183 (EP,US);
F02M26/01 (EP,US);
F02M26/40 (EP,US);
F02M26/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT ABGASRÜCKFÜHRUNGS- UND AUFLADUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2000/26] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING MEANS FOR RECIRCULATING EXHAUST AND TURBO BOOST GASES | [2000/26] | French: | MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE COMPORTANT DES MOYENS DE RECIRCULATION DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT ET DE SURALIMENTATION | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 31.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/44] | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | Société d'Applications Entropologiques Moteurs, S.A. ZA de Trappes Elancourt, 11 rue Denis Papin 78190 Trappes / FR | Date: | 10.01.2002 | [2002/12] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3142891 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * page 7, paragraph 8 - page 15, paragraph 5; figures 1-19; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3137454 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,5 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 3; figures 1-13 *; | [AD]WO9514853 (CURTIL REMI [FR]) [AD] 1-3 * page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 4; figure 1 * * page 16, line 27 - page 18, line 35; figures 11-13 * |