EP1007676 - HIGH AFFINITY IMMUNOGLOBULIN E RECEPTOR-LIKE PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 3174 Porter Drive Palo Alto CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 3174 Porter Drive Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANDMAN, Olga 366 Anna Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
LAL, Preeti 2382 Lass Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 03 /
CORLEY, Neil, C. 1240 Dale Avenue 30 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Wright, Simon Mark, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Wright, Simon Mark, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98943270.3 | 20.08.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998US17271 | Priority number, date | US19970916902 | 21.08.1997 Original published format: US 916902 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9909170 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007676 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C12N15/70, C12N1/21, A61K38/17, C07K16/28, C12Q1/68 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
C07K14/70535 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/24] | Title | German: | IMMUNGLOBULIN E-HOCHAFFINITÄTSREZEPTOR-ÄHNLICHES PROTEIN | [2000/24] | English: | HIGH AFFINITY IMMUNOGLOBULIN E RECEPTOR-LIKE PROTEIN | [2000/24] | French: | PROTEINE RESSEMBLANT AU RECEPTEUR DE L'IMMUNOGLOBULINE E DE HAUTE AFFINITE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 13.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9321317 (US HEALTH [US]) [A] 1-13,17,18 * the whole document * | [X] - Emest7 Database Entry Hs1152201 Accession number AA234138; 6 March 1997 HILLIER L. ET AL.:"The WashU-Merck EST Project", XP002085473 [X] 1-13,17,18 * the whole document * | [X] - Emest8 Database Entry Hs1213902 Accession number AA418443; 14 May 1997 HILLIER L. ET AL.:"The WashU-Marck EST Project 1997", XP002085474 [X] 1-13,17,18 * the whole document * |