blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1025661

EP1025661 - TRANSCEIVER FOR WAVELENGTH MULTIPLEXING PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/32]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHUNK, Nikolaus
Sohlfeld 32
D-31139 Hildesheim / DE
[2000/32]
Application number, filing date98943691.014.07.1998
[2000/32]
WO1998DE01966
Priority number, dateDE199714635021.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19746350
[2000/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9921304
Date:29.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1025661
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1025661
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04B10/24, H04J14/02
[2000/32]
CPC:
H04B10/40 (EP,US); H04J14/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   SE [2000/32]
TitleGerman:TRANSCEIVER FÜR WELLENLÄNGENMULTIPLEX-VERFAHREN[2000/32]
English:TRANSCEIVER FOR WAVELENGTH MULTIPLEXING PROCESSES[2000/32]
French:EMETTEUR-RECEPTEUR DESTINE A UN PROCEDE DE MULTIPLEXAGE PAR REPARTITION EN LONGUEUR D'ONDE[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2000National basic fee paid 
22.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
29.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2003Fee for grant paid
10.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB11.06.2003
SE11.09.2003
[2004/22]
Former [2004/10]SE11.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPH06244797  ;
 [YA]DE1951948  (BERNARD JEAN PIERRE);
 [A]DE3217610  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]);
 [A]GB2308461  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.