EP0961946 - REFLECTIVE LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY (LCD) DEVICE HAVING A REFLECTION REDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSSEN, Peter, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Baele, Ingrid Albertina F.M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Baele, Ingrid Albertina F.M. Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98944183.7 | 08.10.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998IB01562 | Priority number, date | US19970995822 | 22.12.1997 Original published format: US 995822 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932920 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961946 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, G09F9/35 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
G02F1/133512 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G02F1/136 (EP,US);
G02F1/1393 (EP,US);
G02F2203/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/49] | Title | German: | REFLEKTIVE FLÜSSIKRISTALLANZEIGE (LCD) MIT REFLEKTIONSABSCHWÄCHER | [1999/49] | English: | REFLECTIVE LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY (LCD) DEVICE HAVING A REFLECTION REDUCER | [1999/49] | French: | AFFICHEUR A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES (ACL) REFLECHISSANT PRESENTANT UN REDUCTEUR DE REFLEXION | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/33] | 29.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4505547 (SEKIMURA NOBUYUKI [JP]); | [X]EP0569922 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0646831 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]US5056895 (KAHN FREDERIC J [US]); | [A]US4715686 (IWASHITA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) |