EP1015990 - INTERCONNECTION CIRCUIT FOR ELECTRONIC MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flextel S.P.A. Corso Vercelli, 328 10015 Ivrea / IT | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONDOLINI, Alessandro Via Bozzo Costa, 107/7 I-16035 Rapallo / IT | [2000/27] | Application number, filing date | 98944205.8 | 28.08.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998IT00238 | Priority number, date | IT1997TO00796 | 08.09.1997 Original published format: IT TO970796 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9913407 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1015990 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1015990 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
G06F13/409 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSCHALTUNG FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE MODULE | [2000/27] | English: | INTERCONNECTION CIRCUIT FOR ELECTRONIC MODULES | [2000/27] | French: | CIRCUIT DE CONNEXION POUR MODULES ELECTRONIQUES | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 24.10.2001 | FI | 24.10.2001 | LI | 24.10.2001 | NL | 24.10.2001 | DK | 24.01.2002 | PT | 24.01.2002 | SE | 24.01.2002 | GR | 25.01.2002 | [2004/51] |
Former [2003/46] | CH | 24.10.2001 | |
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
NL | 24.10.2001 | ||
DK | 24.01.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | CH | 24.10.2001 | |
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
NL | 24.10.2001 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 24.10.2001 | |
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 24.10.2001 | |
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 24.10.2001 | |
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 24.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5122691 (BALAKRISHNAN BALU [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 21 - line 61 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 32 * * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 35 * * column A; figures 3-5 *; | [XA]WO9315464 (KELLY RALPH HAROLD [GB]) [X] 1-4 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 14, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 1 * * abstract * [A] 5,6; | [A]US5583998 (BOWMAN DAVID A [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 33 - line 56 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 6 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 59 ** column A; figures 2-5 * |