EP0962745 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL SHAPE MEASUREMENT DEVICE AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL ENGRAVER USING THE MEASUREMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PETIO CO., LTD. Oodai Bldg. 6th Floor 9-5, Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | For all designated states Kawamoto, Meitetsu 33-10, Eharacho 3-chome Nakano-ku Tokyo 165-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states PETIO CO., LTD. Oodai Bldg. 6th Floor 9-5, Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kawamoto, Meitetsu 33-10, Eharacho 3-chome Nakano-ku, Tokyo 165-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMOTO, Meitetsu 33-10, Eharacho 3-chome Nakano-ku, Tokyo 165-0023 / JP | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98944244.7 | 25.09.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998JP04313 | Priority number, date | JP19970281066 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: JP 28106697 | [1999/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9917076 | Date: | 08.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962745 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, B24B17/06 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
G05B19/4097 (EP);
G01B11/24 (EP,KR);
G05B19/4207 (EP);
G05B2219/35164 (EP);
G05B2219/37048 (EP);
G05B2219/45212 (EP);
G05B2219/4702 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI [1999/49] | Title | German: | DREI-DIMENSIONALE FORMMESSUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND IHRE ANWENDUNG IN EINER DREI-DIMENSIONALGRAVIERUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [1999/49] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL SHAPE MEASUREMENT DEVICE AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL ENGRAVER USING THE MEASUREMENT DEVICE | [1999/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE FORME TRIDIMENSIONNELLE ET GRAVEUR TRIDIMENSIONNEL UTILISANT CE DISPOSITIF | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1999 | Translation filed | 06.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 06.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 01.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 03.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS61162706 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO); | [A]JPH03138507 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al); | [A]JPH03138508 (KOBE STEEL LTD, et al); | [A]JPH0442010 (KOBERUKO SHISUTEMU KK, et al) |