EP1036328 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING QUANTITAVE MEASUREMENTS OF LOCALIZED ACCUMULATIONS OF MAGNETIC PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quantum Design, Inc. 6325 Lusk Blvd. San Diego, CA 92121-3733 / US | [2005/13] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Quantum Design, Inc. 11578 Sorrento Valley Road, Suite 30 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMMONDS, Michael, Bancroft 123 Commerce Drive, Suite 81 P.O. 2846, Mammoth Lakes, CA 93546 / US | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
SIMMONDS, Michael, Bancroft 123 Commerce Drive, Suite 81 P.O. 2846, Mammuth Lakes, CA 93546 / US | ||
Former [2000/38] | 01 /
SIMMONDS, Michael, Bancroft 4519 Sun Valley Road Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke, Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weber, Seiffert, Dr. Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98944568.9 | 27.08.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998US17815 | Priority number, date | US19970975569 | 21.11.1997 Original published format: US 975569 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927369 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036328 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036328 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/543 (KR);
G01N27/745 (EP,US);
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
G01N35/0098 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | METHODE UND GERÄT ZUR QUANTITATIVEN MESSUNG VON LOKALEN ACCUMULATIONEN MAGNETISCHER PARTIKEL | [2000/38] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING QUANTITAVE MEASUREMENTS OF LOCALIZED ACCUMULATIONS OF MAGNETIC PARTICLES | [2000/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR EFFECTUER DES MESURES QUANTITATIVES D'ACCUMULATIONS LOCALISEES DE PARTICULES MAGNETIQUES | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 13.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.10.2004 | FI | 20.10.2004 | NL | 20.10.2004 | GR | 20.01.2005 | PT | 20.03.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 20.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0449321 (FUJIREBIO KK [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 5, line 43 - line 50; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0625708 (FUJIREBIO KK [JP]) [X] 1,16 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 13, line 16 - line 23 * * column 16, line 9 - line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]US5558839 (MATTE CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract ** column 7, line 4 - line 63; figures 1-4 * |