EP1012341 - AN ALPHA-2 MACROGLOBULIN DIAGNOSTIC TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANZI, Rudolph E. 3 Oceanside Drive Hull, MA 02045 / US | 02 /
HYMAN, Bradley T. 23 Bayview Avenue Swampcott, MA 01907 / US | 03 /
REBECK, George W. Apartment 1, 93 Concord Ave. Sommerville, MA 02143 / US | 04 /
BLACKER, Deborah, L. 31 Brookdale Road Newton, MA 02460 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98944768.5 | 08.09.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US18535 | Priority number, date | US19970057655P | 05.09.1997 Original published format: US 57655 P | US19980093297P | 17.07.1998 Original published format: US 93297 P | US19980148503 | 04.09.1998 Original published format: US 148503 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911824 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012341 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/8107 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | EIN DIAGNOSTISCHER TEST AUF DER BASIS VON ALPHA-2 MAKROGLOBULIN | [2000/26] | English: | AN ALPHA-2 MACROGLOBULIN DIAGNOSTIC TEST | [2000/26] | French: | EPREUVE DIAGNOSTIQUE PORTANT SUR ALPHA-2 MACROGLOBULINE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/02] | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5508167 (ROSES ALLEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XY] - MATTHIJS G ET AL, "A DELETION POLYMORPHISM IN THE HUMAN ALPHA-2-MACROGLOBULIN (A2M) GENE", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19910925), vol. 19, no. 18, ISSN 0305-1048, page 5102, XP001038064 [X] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 16 | [XY] - POLLER W ET AL, "SEQUENCE POLYMORPHISM IN THE HUMAN ALPHA-2-MACROGLOBULIN (A2M) GENE", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1991), vol. 19, ISSN 0305-1048, page 198, XP002915261 [X] 15 * the whole document * [Y] 17,18 | [Y] - BIRKENMEIER G ET AL, "Production of conformation-specific monoclonal antibodies against alpha 2 macroglobulin and their use for quantitation of total and transformed alpha 2 macroglobulin in human blood.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS. NETHERLANDS 4 JUN 1993, (19930604), vol. 162, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 59 - 67, XP002277777 [Y] 16-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(93)90407-X | [A] - QIU WEI QIAO ET AL, "Degradation of amyloid beta-protein by a serine protease-alpha-2-macroglobulin complex", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC.,, US, (1996), vol. 271, no. 14, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 8443 - 8451, XP002140603 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.40.24811 | [A] - NIELSEN KARE L ET AL, "Identification of residues in alpha-macroglobulins important for binding to the alpha-2-macroglobulin receptor/low density lipoprotein receptor-related protein", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC.,, US, (1996), vol. 271, no. 22, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 12909 - 12912, XP002140605 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.22.12909 | International search | [XP] - BLACKER D., ET AL., "ALPHA-2 MACROGLOBULIN IS GENETICALLY ASSOCIATED WITH ALZHEIMER DISEASE.", NATURE GENETICS., Nature Publishing Group, NEW YORK, US, NEW YORK, US, (19980819), vol. 19., doi:10.1038/1243, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 357 - 360., XP002915257 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/1243 | [AP] - PERICAK-VANCE M. A., ET AL., "COMPLETE GENOMIC SCREEN IN LATE-ONSET FAMILIAL ALZHEIMER DISEASE.", JAMA THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, US, US, (19971015), vol. 278., no. 15., doi:10.1001/jama.278.15.1237, ISSN 0098-7484, pages 1237 - 1241., XP002915258 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.278.15.1237 | [AP] - BLACKER D., TANZI R. E., "THE GENETICS OF ALZHEIMER DISEASE.", ARCHIVES OF NEUROLOGY., AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, CHICAGO, IL, US, US, (19980301), vol. 55., doi:10.1001/archneur.55.3.294, ISSN 0003-9942, pages 294 - 296., XP002915259 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archneur.55.3.294 | [A] - SCHELLENBERG G. D., "GENETIC DISSECTION OF ALZHEIMER DISEASE, A HETEROGENEOUS DISORDER.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19950901), vol. 92., doi:10.1073/pnas.92.19.8552, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8552 - 8559., XP002915260 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.19.8552 | [X] - POLLER W., FABER J.-P., OLOK K., "SEQUENCE POLYMORPHISM IN THE HUMAN ALPHA-2-MACROGLOBULIN (A2M) GENE.", Nucleic Acids Research, Information Retrieval Ltd., GB, GB, (19910101), vol. 19., ISSN 0305-1048, page 198., XP002915261 | [X] - JUSTUS C. W. E., ET AL., "QUANTIFICATION OF FREE ALPHA2-MACROGLOBULIN AND ALPHA2- MACROGLOBULIN-PROTEASE COMPLEXES BY A NOVEL ELISA SYSTEM BASED ON STREPTOCOCCAL ALPHA2-MACROGLOBULIN RECEPTORS.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS., ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM., NL, NL, (19900124), vol. 126., doi:10.1016/0022-1759(90)90017-P, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 103 - 108., XP002915262 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(90)90017-P |