blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970592

EP0970592 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING IMPULSE VOLTAGE SEQUENCES TO OPERATE DISCHARGE LAMPS AND CIRCUIT PERTAINING THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.10.2002  [2002/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / VOLLKOMMER, Frank
Neuriederstrasse 18
D-82131 Buchendorf / DE
02 / HITZSCHKE, Lothar
Theodor-Alt-Strasse 6
D-81737 München / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98945001.016.07.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998DE01997
Priority number, dateDE199713488312.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19734883
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9908490
Date:18.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970592
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970592
Date:17.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationIPC:H05B41/00
[2000/02]
CPC:
H05B41/2806 (EP,US); H05B41/02 (KR); H05B41/24 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/40]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN VON IMPULSSPANNUNGSFOLGEN FÜR DEN BETRIEB VON ENTLADUNGSLAMPEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG[2000/02]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING IMPULSE VOLTAGE SEQUENCES TO OPERATE DISCHARGE LAMPS AND CIRCUIT PERTAINING THERETO[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE SERIES D'IMPULSIONS DE TENSION DES LAMPES A DECHARGE, ET CIRCUIT ASSOCIE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase06.04.1999National basic fee paid 
06.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.04.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
16.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2001Fee for grant paid
09.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS60165537  ;
 [A]US5111118  (FELLOWS MARK W [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH08145889
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860114), vol. 010, no. 009, Database accession no. (P - 420), & JP60165537 A 19850828 (OKI DENKI KOGYO KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 096, no. 010, & JP08145889 A 19960607 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.