Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010023205 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9802172 | 29.07.1998 | DE19736653 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001514459 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9802172 | 29.07.1998 | DE19736653 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9253498 | Global Dossier | 16.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9802172 | 29.07.1998 | DE19736653 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1005735 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2005 | B1 | EP1005735 | 07.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9802172 | 29.07.1998 | DE19736653 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9811918 | 15.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9802172 | 29.07.1998 | DE19736653 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2300880 | 04.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9802172 | 29.07.1998 | DE19736653 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6629286 | 30.09.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE9802172 | 29.07.1998 | DE19736653 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9911013 | Global Dossier | 04.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19736653 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1268268 | 27.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19736653 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19736653 | 10.12.1998 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE19736653 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2202153 | 10.04.2003 | C2 | Priority number | Date | DE19736653 | 22.08.1997 |