EP0999987 - AEROSOL CONTAINER COMPRISING A VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/20] | VALVE FOR AEROSOL CONTAINER | ||
[2002/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | ||
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEBE, Michael, Thomas-Glaxo Wellcome Inc. Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Rice, Jason Neale, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN 925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Rice, Jason Neale, et al GlaxoSmithKline, Corporate Intellectual Property, 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2000/20] | Pike, Christopher Gerard, et al Pike & Co. Hayes Loft 68A Hayes Place Marlow, Bucks. SL7 2BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 98945097.8 | 27.07.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998EP04681 | Priority number, date | GB19970015855 | 29.07.1997 Original published format: GB 9715855 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906303 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0999987 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0999987 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/14 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
B65D83/54 (EP,US);
B65D83/14 (KR);
B65D83/38 (EP,US);
B65D83/752 (EP,US);
Y10S277/945 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Extension states | AL | 28.01.2000 | LT | 28.01.2000 | LV | 28.01.2000 | MK | 28.01.2000 | RO | 28.01.2000 | SI | 28.01.2000 | Title | German: | EIN VENTIL ENTHALTENDE AEROSOLDOSE | [2002/16] | English: | AEROSOL CONTAINER COMPRISING A VALVE | [2002/16] | French: | RECIPIENT AEROSOL COMPRENANT UNE SOUPAPE | [2002/16] |
Former [2000/20] | VENTIL FÜR EINE AEROSOLDOSE | ||
Former [2000/20] | VALVE FOR AEROSOL CONTAINER | ||
Former [2000/20] | SOUPAPE POUR RECIPIENT AEROSOL | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 09.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.11.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.06.2003 | BE | 25.06.2003 | CH | 25.06.2003 | FI | 25.06.2003 | LI | 25.06.2003 | CY | 27.07.2003 | LU | 27.07.2003 | IE | 28.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | DK | 25.09.2003 | GR | 25.09.2003 | PT | 25.09.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2003 | ||
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
CY | 27.07.2003 | ||
LU | 27.07.2003 | ||
IE | 28.07.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2003 | ||
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
CY | 27.07.2003 | ||
LU | 27.07.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2003 | ||
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
CY | 27.07.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2003 | ||
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2003 | ||
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 25.06.2003 | |
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2144386 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [Y] 2-4 * page 1, line 22 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, line 2 - line 9 * * page 5, line 5 - line 17 *; | [X]US5027986 (HEINZEL IRVING C [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 23 * * figures 1-4 *; | [XY]WO9632344 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,5-9 * page 4, line 33 - page 8, line 5 * * page 9, line 1 - line 33 * * figures 1A,1B * [Y] 2-4; | [A]FR2740527 (VALOIS [FR]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 29 ** figures 1,2 * | by applicant | WO1994US06900 |