EP1019177 - BASE METAL CATALYST FOR SMALL-SIZE MOTORS AND PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/29] | BASE METAL CATALYST FOR SMALL-SIZE MOTORS | ||
[2003/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGMANN, Andrée Alte Lohmarer Strasse 36 D-53797 Lohmar / DE | 02 /
MAUS, Wolfgang Gut Horst D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle,Pagenberg,Dost,Altenburg,Geissler,Isenbruck Uerdinger Str. 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98945215.6 | 12.08.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998EP05098 | Priority number, date | DE1997136628 | 22.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19736628 | [2000/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9910081 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1019177 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019177 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01J35/04, F01N3/05, F01N3/28 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP);
B01D53/9454 (EP);
B01J35/56 (EP);
F01N3/05 (EP);
F01N3/281 (EP);
F01N2260/022 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/29] | B01D53/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2000/29] | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR AUS UNEDLEM METALL FÜR EINEN KLEINMOTOR SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2003/22] | English: | BASE METAL CATALYST FOR SMALL-SIZE MOTORS AND PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION | [2003/22] | French: | CATALYSEUR EN METAL COMMUN POUR MOTEUR DE PETITE DIMENSION ET PROCEDE POUR SA PRODCUTION | [2003/22] |
Former [2000/29] | KATALYSATOR AUS UNEDLEM METALL FÜR EINEN KLEINMOTOR | ||
Former [2000/29] | BASE METAL CATALYST FOR SMALL-SIZE MOTORS | ||
Former [2000/29] | CATALYSEUR EN METAL COMMUN POUR MOTEUR DE PETITE DIMENSION | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 14.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Request for further processing for: | 14.11.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 14.11.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.12.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS58104084 ; | [AD]DE3729477 (STIHL MASCHF ANDREAS [DE]) [AD] 1,2,15,16 * claims 1,8 *; | [A]DE3804722 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * claims 1-4 *; | [X]DE4416469 (KOPPE JUERGEN DR [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,17-19 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE19536752 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) [A] 1* claims 1,10 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 30, Database accession no. 83-720731, XP002092958 & JPS58104084 A 19830621 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) [A] 1-5,7,17-19,21 * abstract * | Examination | DE4017267 | WO9623133 |