EP0969797 - OXIDIZING COMPOSITION AND USES FOR DYEING, PERMANENTLY SETTING OR BLEACHING KERATIN FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/02] | OXIDISING COMPOSITION AND USES FOR DYEING, PERMANENTLY SETTING OR BLEACHING KERATIN FIBRES | ||
[2004/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LA METTRIE, Roland 6, boulevard d'Angleterre F-78110 Le Vesinet / FR | 02 /
COTTERET, Jean 13, rue du Pré Rousselin F-78480 Verneuil sur Seine / FR | 03 /
DE LABBEY, Arnaud 9, rue Charles Dordain F-93600 Aulnay sous Bois / FR | 04 /
MAUBRU, Mireille 7, avenue d'Eprémesnil F-78400 Chatou / FR | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Miszputen, Laurent, et al L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Miszputen, Laurent, et al L'Oréal - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [2000/02] | Miszputen, Laurent, et al L'Oreal, DPI, 6 rue Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98945349.3 | 22.09.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998FR02025 | Priority number, date | FR19970012359 | 03.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9712359 | [2000/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9917726 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0969797 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0969797 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/13, A61K7/09, A61K7/135 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
A61Q5/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/66 (EP,US);
A61Q5/08 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Title | German: | OXIDATIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG ZUM FÄRBEN, ZUR DAUERHAFTEN VERFORMUNG UND ZUM ENTFÄRBEN DER HAARE | [2004/52] | English: | OXIDIZING COMPOSITION AND USES FOR DYEING, PERMANENTLY SETTING OR BLEACHING KERATIN FIBRES | [2004/52] | French: | COMPOSITION OXYDANTE ET UTILISATIONS POUR LA TEINTURE, POUR LA DEFORMATION PERMANENTE OU POUR LA DECOLORATION DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES | [2000/02] |
Former [2000/02] | OXIDATIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG ZUM FÄRBEN, ZUR DAUERHAFTEN VERFORMUNG UND ZUM ENTFÄRBEN DER HAAREN | ||
Former [2000/02] | OXIDISING COMPOSITION AND USES FOR DYEING, PERMANENTLY SETTING OR BLEACHING KERATIN FIBRES | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2005 | FI | 03.08.2005 | IE | 03.08.2005 | NL | 03.08.2005 | BE | 30.09.2005 | CH | 30.09.2005 | LI | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | LU | 03.10.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | GR | 03.11.2005 | SE | 03.11.2005 | PT | 03.01.2006 | [2007/18] |
Former [2006/42] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DX]FR2586913 (OREAL [FR]) [DX] 23* the whole document *; | [DA]EP0310675 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [DA] 1-7,10,12-14,16-21 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0548621 (GOLDWELL AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,17-20,24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0548620 (GOLDWELL AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,17-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9400100 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-7,17,19-21 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0716846 (YAMAHATSU SANGYO KAISHA [JP]) [X] 1-7,10,12-14,16-21 * example - *; | [A]DE19547991 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,10-13,17-21,24,25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0795313 (WELLA AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,10,12-14,16-21 * the whole document * |