Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7495448 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2009 | B2 | US2004212368 | 28.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9720835 | 02.10.1997 | US50988200 | 31.03.2000 | US25203502 | 20.09.2002 | US84352804 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9274398 | Global Dossier | 27.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9720835 | 02.10.1997 | GB9802949 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1031044 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2004 | B1 | EP1031044 | 30.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9720835 | 02.10.1997 | GB9802949 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE266210T | 15.05.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9720835 | 02.10.1997 | GB9802949 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69823691T | 09.06.2005 | T2 | DE69823691D1 | 09.06.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9720835 | 02.10.1997 | GB9802949 | 02.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6747456 | 08.06.2004 | B2 | US2003020478 | 30.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9720835 | 02.10.1997 | US50988200 | 31.03.2000 | US25203502 | 20.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9918448 | Global Dossier | 15.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9720835 | 02.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9720835D0 | 03.12.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9720835 | 02.10.1997 |