EP1125442 - A DIGITAL CUT-OFF CONTROL LOOP FOR TV USING SPEEDING AND BLANKING CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Asia Pacific Pte Ltd. 28 Ang Mo Kio Industrial Park 2 Singapore 569508 / SG | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2001/51] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Asia Pacific Pte Ltd. 28 Ang Mo Kio Industrial Park 2 Singapore 569508 / SG | ||
For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, avenue Galliéni 94253 Gentilly Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESPREZ-LE GOARANT, Yann 28 Ang Mo Kio Industrial Park 2 Singapore 569508 / SG | 02 /
JAFFARD, Jean-Luc 4 bis, rue du Cotaire F-38120 Saint Egrève / FR | 03 /
MICHON, Christian 28 Ang Mo Kio Industrial Park 2 Singapore 569508 / SG | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Cerbaro, Elena, Dr., et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98945750.2 | 25.09.1998 | [2001/34] | WO1998SG00076 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0019727 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1125442 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1125442 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/64, H04N9/72 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
H04N9/645 (EP,US);
H04N9/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/34] | Title | German: | DIGITALER SPERRSPANNUNGSREGELKREIS MIT DUNKELTASTUNG- UND BESCHLEUNIGUNGSSCHALTUNGEN FÜR FERSEHGERÄT | [2001/34] | English: | A DIGITAL CUT-OFF CONTROL LOOP FOR TV USING SPEEDING AND BLANKING CIRCUITS | [2001/34] | French: | BOUCLE DE COMMANDE DE COUPURE NUMERIQUE POUR TELEVISION UTILISANT DES CIRCUITS D'ACCELERATION ET DE SUPPRESSION | [2001/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4689665 (JOHANNES KURT J [DE], et al); | [X]US5339011 (TAMURA TAKAHIKO [JP], et al); |