EP0979150 - COATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 2500 Renaissance Boulevard, Suite 200 Gulph Mills Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 2500 Renaissance Boulevard, Suite 200 Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORNELL, Kevin 158 Linwood Rochester, MI 48307 / US | 02 /
HUFFMAN, W., Craig 1356 Adirondack Drive Northbrook, IL 60062 / US | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | ||
Former [2000/07] | Sanderson, Laurence Andrew, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 98945810.4 | 04.09.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998US18000 | Priority number, date | US19970928510 | 12.09.1997 Original published format: US 928510 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9913992 | Date: | 25.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979150 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979150 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B05C1/00, B05D1/00 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
B05C1/0813 (EP,ES,US);
B05C1/06 (EP,ES,US);
B05C9/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AUFTRAGSMASCHINE | [2000/07] | English: | COATING APPARATUS | [2000/07] | French: | APPAREIL DE REVETEMENT | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 28.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 16.05.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 10.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.11.2002 | CH | 20.11.2002 | FI | 20.11.2002 | GR | 20.11.2002 | LI | 20.11.2002 | DK | 20.02.2003 | PT | 20.02.2003 | [2007/18] |
Former [2003/51] | BE | 20.11.2002 | |
CH | 20.11.2002 | ||
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
LI | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 20.11.2002 | |
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
LI | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | CH | 20.11.2002 | |
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
LI | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 20.11.2002 | |
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 20.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3427840 (RICHTER WALTER) | International search | [X]US5549752 (HAHN ROGER [US], et al); | [XP]US5698031 (WINKLE WILLIAM L [US]) |