EP1000286 - QUICK-ACTION COUPLING, ESPECIALLY FOR PLAIN END PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weh, Erwin Siemensstrasse 5 89257 Illertissen / DE | For all designated states Weh, Wolfgang Siemensstr. 5 89257 Illertissen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Weh, Erwin Siemensstrasse 5 D-89257 Illertissen / DE | ||
For all designated states WEH, Wolfgang Siemensstr. 5 D-89257 Illertissen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Fiener, Josef Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 98946271.8 | 03.08.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998EP04829 | Priority number, date | DE1997213794U | 02.08.1997 Original published format: DE 29713794 U | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906752 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000286 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000286 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/05, F16L37/12, G01M3/02 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
F16L37/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/20] | Title | German: | SCHNELLANSCHLUSS, INSBESONDERE FÜR GLATTROHRE | [2000/20] | English: | QUICK-ACTION COUPLING, ESPECIALLY FOR PLAIN END PIPES | [2000/20] | French: | RACCORD RAPIDE, EN PARTICULIER POUR TUBES LISSES | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 14.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3499469 (VIZUETE BENNIE, et al) [A] 1* figures 1-3; claims 1-5 *; | [YA]US3868132 (RACINE WILLIAM H) [Y] 3,4 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [XY]US3962769 (SMIDA GEORGE R) [X] 1,2,6-8,13 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4; | [XAY]US4540201 (RICHARDSON WILLIAM D [US]) [X] 1,2,6-10,13 * the whole document * [A] 5,11,12 [Y] 3,4 |