blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975758

EP0975758 - POLYPEPTIDE HAVING A GTPase REGULATOR ACTIVITY, NUCLEIC ACIDS CODING THEREFOR AND THEIR USE IN DIAGNOSTICS AND THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lampert, Fritz, Professor Dr.
Liebigstrasse 48
35392 Giessen / DE
For all designated states
Borkhardt, Arndt, Dr.
Schiffenberger Weg 9c
35435 Wettenberg / DE
[2000/07]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Lampert, Fritz, Professor Dr.
Liebigstrasse 48
35392 Giessen / DE
For all designated states
Borkhardt, Arndt, Dr.
Sonnenstrasse 2
35444 Biebertal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Lederer, Franz, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Lederer, Franz, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/05]Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al
Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98946325.213.08.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998EP05143
Priority number, dateEP1997011411214.08.1997         Original published format: EP 97114112
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9909157
Date:25.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975758
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.02.1999
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/12, C12N15/85, C07K14/47, C07K14/82, A61K38/17, C12Q1/68, C07K16/32
[2000/05]
CPC:
C07K14/4706 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP); A61K38/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:PEPTIDE MIT GTPASE-AKTIVIERENDE WIRKUNG, DAFÜR KODIERENDE NUKLEINSAUREN, SOWIE DEREN DIAGNOSTISCHE UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG[2000/05]
English:POLYPEPTIDE HAVING A GTPase REGULATOR ACTIVITY, NUCLEIC ACIDS CODING THEREFOR AND THEIR USE IN DIAGNOSTICS AND THERAPY[2000/05]
French:POLYPEPTIDE A ACTIVITE REGULATRICE DE LA GTPase, ACIDES NUCLEIQUES CODANT CE POLYPEPTIDE ET UTILISATION DE CES ACIDES ET POLYPEPTIDE DANS DES DIAGNOSTICS ET THERAPIES[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase30.11.1999National basic fee paid 
30.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
23.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/30]
13.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]  - HILDEBRAND J.D. ET AL., "Gallus gallus rhoGAP protein mRNA, complete cds", EMBL, (19960914), XP002052690 [X] 9,11-15 * 82.1 % identity in 1804 bp overlap * * 34 bp fragment identity at pos 506-539 with 47-80 of U36309 * * 92.1% identity in 584 AA overlap * [A] 1-5
    [ ] - HILDEBRAND J.D. ET AL., "An SH3 domain-containing GTPase-activating protein for Rho and Cdc42 associates with focal adhesion kinase.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, US, (199606), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 3169 - 3178, XP002052720
 [X]  - NCI-CGAP, "nh34b08.s1 NCI_CGAP_Pr3 Homo sapiens cDNA clone 954231 similar to WP:ZK328.3 CE05067 BREAKPOINT CLUSTER REGION; N-CHIMAERIN ;.", EMBL, (19970719), XP002052691 [X] 9,11-15 * 96.9 % identity in 327 bp overlap * * 132 bp fragment identity at pos 2187-2318 with 226-97 of AA524599 *
 [A]  - HILLIER L. ET AL., "ze24f05.s1 Soares fetal heart NbHH19W Homo sapiens cDNA clone 359937 3'.", EMBL, XP002052692 [A] 1 * 95 identical AA at pos 35-129 with 26-120 of AA035622 *
 [A]  - BORKHARDT A. ET AL., "Cloning and characterisation of AFX, the gene that fuses to MLL in acute leukemias with t(X;11)(q13;q23).", ONCOGENE, BASINGSTOKE, GB, (19970116), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 195 - 202, XP002052689 [A] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1200814
 [PX]  - OHARA O ET AL, "Homo sapiens mRNA for KIAA0621 protein, partial cds.", EMBL, (19980715), XP002088633 [PX] 1-5,9,11-15 * 99% identity in 3140 bp overlap with SEQ ID 2* * 99.4% identity in 640 AA overlap with SEQ ID 1 *
    [ ] - ISHIKAWA K ET AL, "Prediction of the coding sequences of unidentified human genes. X. The complete sequences of 100 new cDNA clones from brain which can code for large proteins in vitro.", DNA RESEARCH, (19980630), vol. 5, pages 169 - 176, XP002089186 [ ] * tables 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/dnares/5.3.169
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.