EP1012193 - CATALYST PREPARATION FOR THE (CO)POLYMERISATION OF ALK-1-ENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Am Yachthafen 2 77694 Kehl / DE | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONIOUKH, Andrei Salierstrasse 11 D-67373 Dudenhofen / DE | 02 /
DECKERS, Andreas Schulstrasse 11 D-55234 Flomborn / DE | 03 /
SCHAUSS, Eckard Kirchenstrasse 1 D-67259 Heuchelheim / DE | 04 /
KLIMESCH, Roger Georg-Fröba-Strasse 43 D-64665 Alsbach-Hähnlein / DE | 05 /
WEBER, Wilhelm Mandelbergstrasse 40 D-67435 Neustadt / DE | [2000/26] | Application number, filing date | 98946384.9 | 19.08.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998EP05274 | Priority number, date | DE1997137306 | 27.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19737306 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9910388 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012193 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1012193 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/629, C08F10/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/63922 (EP,KR,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/63908 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/63916 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/63912 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/03 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/16, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/03 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | KATALYSATORZUBEREITUNG FÜR DIE (CO)POLYMERISATION VON ALK-1-ENEN | [2000/26] | English: | CATALYST PREPARATION FOR THE (CO)POLYMERISATION OF ALK-1-ENES | [2000/26] | French: | PREPARATION CATALYSATEUR DESTINEE A LA (CO)POLYMERISATION D'ALC-1-ENES | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.04.2003
30.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Borealis Technology OY P.O.Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI Opponent's representative Campbell, Neil Boyd, et al, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.04.2003
30.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE Borealis Technology OY P.O.Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI Opponent's representative Campbell, Neil Boyd, et al, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2003/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.04.2003
Borealis Technology OY P.O.Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI Opponent's representative Campbell, Neil Boyd, et al, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EV4V 4EL / GB | 23.05.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.11.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.11.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/11] | Appeal following opposition | 23.10.2006 | Appeal received No. T1621/06 | 22.12.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.11.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 27.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.08.2002 | SE | 17.10.2002 | BE | 31.08.2006 | NL | 01.03.2007 | [2007/31] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 19.08.2002 | |
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
NL | 01.03.2007 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 19.08.2002 | |
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 17.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0675138 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [A] 1* example 3 *; | [A]EP0741146 (ENICHEM SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * claims 1,6,12 * * example 1 * |