EP1017392 - MEDICAMENT FORMULATION WITH A CONTROLLED RELEASE OF AN ACTIVE AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2002/29] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEFERT, Hans-Martin Briller Strasse 99 D-42105 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
BOSCHE, Patrick Schlinghofener Strasse 36 D-51519 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
STASS, Heino Morgengraben 10 D-51061 Köln / DE | 04 /
KETTELHOIT, Stefan Robert-Medenwald-Strasse 5 D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
LAICH, Tobias Andreas-Gryphius-Strasse 26 D-51065 Köln / DE | [2000/28] | Application number, filing date | 98946454.0 | 15.09.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998EP05842 | Priority number, date | DE1997142243 | 25.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19742243 | [2000/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9915172 | Date: | 01.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1017392 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1017392 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K9/28, A61K9/00 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
A61K9/5078 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (KR);
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Extension states | LT | 25.04.2000 | LV | 25.04.2000 | RO | 25.04.2000 | SI | 25.04.2000 | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTELFORMULIERUNG MIT KONTROLLIERTER WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNG | [2000/28] | English: | MEDICAMENT FORMULATION WITH A CONTROLLED RELEASE OF AN ACTIVE AGENT | [2000/28] | French: | FORMULATION MEDICAMENTEUSE A LIBERATION CONTROLEE DU PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0350733 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1,8,13,15-20 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0550903 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1,8,13,15-20 * the whole document *; | JPH0624959 [ ] (BAYER YAKUHIN KK); | [AD]EP0780390 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1,8,13,15-20 * the whole document *; | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940627), vol. 120, no. 26, Database accession no. 331151, XP002090750 [AD] 1,8,13,15-20 * abstract * |