14.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
30.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
03.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
04.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
21.10.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] |
22.07.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
13.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
06.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] |
29.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |
29.10.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
26.10.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.10.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.04.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.01.2004 |
First examination report |
|
20.01.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.08.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
28.03.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] |
25.01.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] |
19.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.05.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
26.05.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
13.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
03.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|