Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9351198 | Global Dossier | 23.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FI9800758 | 24.09.1998 | FI973805 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1018277 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2004 | B1 | EP1018277 | 12.07.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI9800758 | 24.09.1998 | FI973805 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE285157T | 15.01.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FI9800758 | 24.09.1998 | FI973805 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69828185T | 22.12.2005 | T2 | DE69828185D1 | 20.01.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FI9800758 | 24.09.1998 | FI973805 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6501948 | 31.12.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FI9800758 | 24.09.1998 | FI973805 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9917565 | Global Dossier | 17.06.1999 | A3 | WO9917565 | 08.04.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI973805 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1164135C | 25.08.2004 | C | CN1271499 | 25.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | FI973805 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI104936B | 28.04.2000 | B | FI973805 | 27.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | FI973805 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY135499 | 30.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | FI973805 | 26.09.1997 |