EP1019510 - VACCINES DERIVED FROM PORCINE CIRCOVIRUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/29] | PORCINE CIRCOVIRUSES, VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTIC REAGENTS | ||
[2003/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERIAL 17, rue Bourgelat 69002 Lyon / FR | For all designated states The Queen's University of Belfast Stoney Road, Stormont Belfast BT4 3SD / GB | For all designated states The University of Saskatchewan 52 Campus Drive Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7W 5B4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states MERIAL 17, rue Bourgelat 69002 Lyon / FR | ||
For all designated states The Queen's University of Belfast Stoney Road, Stormont Belfast BT4 3SD / GB | |||
For all designated states The University of Saskatchewan 52 Campus Drive Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7W 5B4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLAN, Gordon 51 Cabinhill Gardens Belfast BT5 7AQ / GB | 02 /
MEEHAN, Brian 26 St. John's Close, 2 Laganbank Road Belfast BT1 3LX / GB | 03 /
CLARK, Edward 22 Murphy Crescent Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7J 214 / CA | 04 /
ELLIS, John 812, 13th Street East Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 0M3 / CA | 05 /
HAINES, Deborah 812, 13th Street East Saskatoon, Saskatchewan SN7 0M3 / CA | 06 /
HASSARD, Lori 443 Perreault Lane Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7K 2A0 / CA | 07 /
HARDING, John 43 Jubilee Drive Humboldt, Saskatchewan 2 S0K 2A0 / CA | 08 /
CHARREYRE, Catherine, Elisabeth 42, rue Ferdinand Gauthier F-69720 Saint-Laurent de Mure / FR | 09 /
CHAPPUIS, Gilles, Emile 3, rue Laurent Vibert F-69006 Lyon / FR | 10 /
MCNEILLY, Francis 4 Lisleen Place Newtownards, BT3 4NH / GB | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Colombet, Alain André, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2,Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98946547.1 | 01.10.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998FR02107 | Priority number, date | FR19970012382 | 03.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9712382 | FR19980000873 | 22.01.1998 Original published format: FR 9800873 | FR19980003707 | 20.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9803707 | [2000/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918214 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019510 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019510 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/34, C07K14/01, A61K39/12, A61K48/00, C12Q1/68, C07K16/08, G01N33/53 | [2000/29] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | SCHWEINECIRCOVIREN ABGELEITETE IMPFSTOFFE | [2003/04] | English: | VACCINES DERIVED FROM PORCINE CIRCOVIRUSES | [2003/04] | French: | VACCINS A BASE DE CIRCOVIRUS PORCINS | [2003/04] |
Former [2000/29] | SCHWEINECIRCOVIREN, IMPFSTOFFE UND DIAGNOSTISCHE REAGENZIEN | ||
Former [2000/29] | PORCINE CIRCOVIRUSES, VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTIC REAGENTS | ||
Former [2000/29] | CIRCOVIRUS PORCINS, VACCINS ET REACTIFS DE DIAGNOSTIC | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 25.07.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02017134.4 / EP1281760 | EP03016998.1 / EP1386617 | EP05014998.8 / EP1741785 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO9606619 (PAUL PREM S [US], et al) [Y] 8-10,23-26 * abstract * * page 189 - page 195; claim - * [A] 18-22; | [XDAY] - NAYAR G.P.S. ET AL., "Detection and characterization of porcine circovirus associated with postweaning multisystemic wasting syndrome in pigs", CANADIAN VETERINARY JOURNAL - REVUE VETERINAIRE CANADIENNE, (199706), vol. 38, pages 385 - 386, XP002068396 [XD] 1-7,28,29 * the whole document * [A] 27 [Y] 8-10,23-26 | [XD] - CLARK E. G., "Post-weaning multisystemic wasting syndrome", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF SWINE PRACTITIONERS. ANNUAL MEETING, (19970301), pages 499 - 501, XP002068397 [XD] 1-7,28,29 * page 500, column R, lines 18-39 * | [PX] - MEEHAN B.M. ET AL., "Characterization of novel circovirus DNAs associated with wasting syndromes in pigs", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (199809), vol. 79, no. 9, pages 2171 - 2179, XP002090386 [PX] 1-7,11-17,19,27-29 * the whole document * | [PX] - HAMEL A.L. ET AL., "Nucleotide sequence of Porcine Circovirus associated with postweaning multisystemic wasting syndrome in pigs", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (199806), vol. 72, no. 6, pages 5262 - 5267, XP002078783 [PX] 1-14,27 * the whole document * | [PX] - MOROZOV I. ET AL., "Detection of a novel strain of porcine circovirus in pigs with postweaning multisystemic wasting syndrome", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199809), vol. 36, no. 9, pages 2535 - 2541, XP002090921 [PX] 1-7,11-14,27,29 * the whole document * | [AD] - MEEHAN B.M. ET AL., "Sequence of porcine circovirus DNA: affinities with plant circoviruses", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (199701), vol. 78, no. 1, pages 221 - 227, XP002068398 [AD] 11-14 * page 224; figure 3 * | [AD] - MANKERTZ A. ET AL., "Mapping and characterization of the origin of DNA replication of porcine circovirus", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (199703), vol. 71, no. 3, pages 2562 - 2566, XP002078782 [AD] 11-14 * page 2563, column L; figure 1 * * page 2566, column L, paragraph 2 * |