EP1012300 - HNK-1 SULFOTRANSFERASE AND METHODS OF USE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acorda Therapeutics 15 Skyline Drive Hawthorne, NY 10531 / US | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANTEI, Ned Riedhofstrasse 372 CH-8049 Zurich / CH | 02 /
BAKKER, Hendrikus Meerburgerkade 78 NL-2314 VS Leiden / NL | 03 /
SCHACHNER, Melitta Ekkehardstrasse 8 CH-8006 Zurich / CH | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98946870.7 | 04.09.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US18572 | Priority number, date | US19970924812 | 05.09.1997 Original published format: US 924812 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911796 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012300 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/54, C12N9/10, C12N15/86, C12N5/10, A61K31/70, C07K19/00, C07K16/40, A61K48/00 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C12N9/13 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/26] | Title | German: | HNK-1 SULFOTRANSFERASE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2000/26] | English: | HNK-1 SULFOTRANSFERASE AND METHODS OF USE THEREFOR | [2000/26] | French: | SULFOTRANSFERASE HNK-1 ET SES METHODES D'UTILISATION | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 29.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 12.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA] - KOJI TERAYAMA ET AL., "Cloning and functional expression of a novel glucuronyltransferase involved in the biosynthesis of the carbohydrate epitope HNK-1", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, (19970610), vol. 94, no. 12, pages 6093 - 6098, XP002087867 [DA] 1-28 * abstract * * page 6097, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.12.6093 | [DA] - AMJAD A. ILYAS ET AL., "Variability in the structural requirements for binding of human monoclonal anti-myelin-associated glycoprotein immunoglobulin << | [DA] - KOICHI HONKE ET AL., "Purification and characterization of 3'-Phosphoadenosine-5'-Phosphosulfate:GalCer Sulfotransferase from human renal cancer cells", THE JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (199603), vol. 119, no. 3, pages 421 - 426, XP002087869 [DA] 1-28 * the whole document * | | [PX] - BAKKER H ET AL, "Expression cloning of a cDNA encoding a sulfotransferase involved in the biosynthesis of the HNK -1 carbohydrate epitope.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997 NOV 21) 272 (47) 29942-6. JOURNAL CODE: HIV. ISSN: 0021-9258., United States, XP002087870 [PX] 1-28 * the whole document * | DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.47.29942 | [PX] - ONG E ET AL, "Expression cloning of a human sulfotransferase that directs the synthesis of the HNK -1 glycan on the neural cell adhesion molecule and glycolipids.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1998 FEB 27) 273 (9) 5190-5. JOURNAL CODE: HIV. ISSN: 0021-9258., United States, XP002087871 [PX] 1-28 * the whole document * | DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.9.5190 | [PX] - R55u061 Database Entry Af070594 Accession number AF070594; 5 August 1998 YU W. ET AL.:"Homo sapiens clone 24570 HNK-1 sulfotransferase mRNA, complete cds.", XP002087872 [PX] 8-15,20,23-25 * the whole document * | | [PX] - Emhum1 Database Entry Af033827 Accession number AF033827; 10 March 1998 ONG E. ET AL.:"Homo sapiens HNK-1 sulfotransferase mRNA, complete cds.", XP002087873 [PX] 8-15,20,23-25 * the whole document * | |