EP1015586 - TIE RECEPTOR TYROSINE KINASE LIGAND HOMOLOGUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states GENENTECH, INC. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONG, Sherman 19 Basinside Way Alameda, CA 94502 / US | 02 /
FERRARA, Napoleone 2090 Pacific Avenue San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | 03 /
GODDARD, Audrey 110 Congo Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 04 /
GODOWSKI, Paul, J. 2627 Easton Drive Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 05 /
GURNEY, Austin, L. 1 Debbie Lane Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 06 /
HILLAN, Kenneth 64 Seward San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 07 /
WILLIAMS, P., Mickey 509 Alto Avenue Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98946988.7 | 14.09.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US19094 | Priority number, date | US19970934494 | 19.09.1997 Original published format: US 934494 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9915654 | Date: | 01.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1015586 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1015586 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/475, C07K14/515, C07K16/22, C12N5/10, G01N33/53, A61K38/18 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
C07K14/475 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | HOMOLOGE DES TIE-REZEPTORTYROSINEKINASE LIGANDEN | [2005/25] | English: | TIE RECEPTOR TYROSINE KINASE LIGAND HOMOLOGUES | [2000/27] | French: | HOMOLOGUES DU LIGAND "TIE" DU TYPE TYROSINE KINASE RECEPTRICE | [2000/27] |
Former [2000/27] | TIE REZEPTORTYROSINEKINASE LIGANDHOMOLOGEN | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04012203.8 / EP1482040 | EP04012204.6 / EP1482041 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9611269 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [DA] 1-23 * abstract *; | [A]WO9631598 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-23* abstract *; | [AD] - MAISONPIERRE P C ET AL, "ANGIOPOIETIN-2, A NATURAL ANTAGONIST FOR TIE2 THAT DISRUPTS IN VIVO ANGIOGENESIS", SCIENCE, (19970704), vol. 277, pages 55 - 60, XP002046280 [AD] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5322.55 | [AD] - DAVIS S ET AL, "Isolation of angiopoietin-1, a ligand for the TIE2 receptor, by secretion-trap expression cloning [see comments]", CELL, DEC 27 1996, 87 (7) P1161-9, UNITED STATES, XP002101513 [AD] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)81812-7 |