EP1017826 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING PKB KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONYX PHARMACEUTICALS 3031 Research Drive, Building A Richmond, CA 94806-5206 / US | For all designated states THE BABRAHAM INSTITUTE Babraham Hall Babraham, Cambridge CB2 4AT / GB | [2000/49] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states ONYX PHARMACEUTICALS 3031 Research Drive, Building A Richmond, CA 94806-5206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPHENS, Len 3 Kingfisher Close Sawston Cambridge LB2 4JQ / GB | 02 /
HAWKINGS, Philip 7 South Terrace Sawston Cambridge CB2 4JQ / GB | 03 /
STOKOE, David 1221 Gilman Street Berkeley, CA 94706 / US | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98947088.5 | 17.09.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998US19412 | Priority number, date | US19970060190 | 26.09.1997 Original published format: US 60190 | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9916887 | Date: | 08.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1017826 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/54, C12N9/12, C07K16/40, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
C12N9/1205 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION VON INHIBITOREN DER PKB-KINASE | [2000/28] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING PKB KINASE INHIBITORS | [2000/28] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET TECHNIQUES PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER LES INHIBITEURS DE LA KINASE DE LA PKB | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 02.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/16] | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO9841638 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL) [E] 1-7,9-12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO9722360 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL ;UNIV DUNDEE (GB); COHEN PHILIP (GB); ALESSI D) [DX] 9 * claim 34 *; | [DX] - ALESSI D R ET AL, "Characterization of a 3- phosphoinositide -dependent protein kinase which phosphorylates and activates protein kinase Balpha.", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (19970319), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 261 - 269, XP002070053 [DX] 1-7,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(06)00122-9 | [X] - ALESSI D R ET AL, "3-phosphoinositide-dependent protein kinase-1 (PDK1): Structural and functional homology with the Drosophila DSTPK61 kinase.", CURRENT BIOLOGY 7 (10). 1997. 776-789. ISSN: 0960-9822, (19970918), XP002070054 [X] 1-12,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(06)00336-8 | [X] - STOKOE ET AL, "Dual role of phosphatidyl-3,4,5-triphosphate in the activation of protein kinase B", SCIENCE, (19970725), vol. 277, pages 567 - 570, XP002070055 [X] 1-7,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5325.567 | [X] - P. COHEN ET AL., "PDK1, one of the missing links in insulin signal transduction?", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970623), vol. 410, no. 1, pages 3 - 10, XP002098146 [X] 14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(97)00490-0 | [DA] - ALESSI D ET AL, "Mechanism of activation of protein kinase B by insulin and IGF-1", THE EMBO JOURNAL, (1996), vol. 15, no. 23, pages 6541 - 6551, XP002070051 [DA] 1-12,14,15 | [A] - ALESSI D ET AL, "Molecular basis for the substrate specificity of protein kinase B", FEBS LETTERS, (1996), vol. 399, pages 333 - 338, XP002070052 [A] 1-12,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(96)01370-1 | [A] - HEMMINGS B A, "PtdIns(3,4,5)P3 gets its message across [comment].", SCIENCE, (19970725), vol. 277, page 534, XP002070056 [A] 1-12,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5325.534 | [PX] - L. STEPHENS ET AL., "Protein kinase B kinases that mediate phosphatidylinositol 3,4,5-triphosphate-dependent activation of protein kinase B", SCIENCE, AAAS,WASHINGTON,DC,US, (19980130), vol. 279, pages 710 - 714, XP002098138 [PX] 1-12,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.279.5351.710 |