EP1017733 - PRESSURIZED CAN OR CARTRIDGE CONTAINING A PREPOLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/28] | PREPOLYMER COMPOSITION | ||
[2000/42] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2001 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RATHOR AG Rütistrasse 9050 Appenzell / CH | [2000/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NÜTZEL, Rainer Berg 411 CH-9057 Weissbad / CH | 02 /
SOMMER, Heinrich Brand, Rinkenbach CH-9050 Appenzell / CH | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Thiel, Christian Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Thiel, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Westfalenbankgebäude) 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 98947507.4 | 03.09.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998EP05578 | Priority number, date | DE1997138670 | 04.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19738670 | [2000/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911687 | Date: | 11.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1017733 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/00 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
C08J9/14 (EP);
C08G18/12 (EP);
C08G18/36 (EP);
C08G18/58 (EP);
C08J2375/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/307 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [2000/28] | Title | German: | DRUCKDOSE ODER KARTUSCHE ENTHALTEND EINE PREPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2000/42] | English: | PRESSURIZED CAN OR CARTRIDGE CONTAINING A PREPOLYMER COMPOSITION | [2000/42] | French: | RECIPIENT SOUS PRESSION OU CARTOUCHE CONTENANT UNE COMPOSITION DE PREPOLYMERE | [2000/42] |
Former [2000/28] | PREPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | ||
Former [2000/28] | PREPOLYMER COMPOSITION | ||
Former [2000/28] | COMPOSITION DE PREPOLYMERE | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 13.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/02] | 21.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2001 | 30.09.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4766158 (S.FUZESI ET AL.) [A] 1-5,9,10,14 * claim 1; table I *; | [A]DD238992 (SCHWARZHEIDE SYNTHESEWERK VEB) [A] 1-7,9,10 * page 1, paragraph 2; example -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2542489 (MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.) [A] 1-5,9,10,14 * examples 23,28; claims 1,12,27 *; | [A]EP0499053 (BASF AG) [A] 1-7,9-11,13,14 * page 8, line 42 - page 9, line 32; claim 1 * |