EP1023709 - HIGH SENSITIVITY PARTICLE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIDDE FIRE PROTECTION LIMITED Pentagon House Sir Frank Whittle Road Derby DE21 4XA / GB | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POWELL, Brian 22 Loosen Drive Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 3UR / GB | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Bibby, William Mark, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Bibby, William Mark, et al Mathisen, Macara & Co., The Coach House, 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98947664.3 | 13.10.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998GB03079 | Priority number, date | GB19970021861 | 15.10.1997 Original published format: GB 9721861 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9919852 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023709 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023709 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/107 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
G08B17/107 (EP,US);
G08B17/113 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | PARTIKELDETEKTION MIT HOHER EMPFINDLICHKEIT | [2000/31] | English: | HIGH SENSITIVITY PARTICLE DETECTION | [2000/31] | French: | DETECTION HAUTE SENSIBILITE DE PARTICULES | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 08.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 03.07.2002 | GR | 03.07.2002 | PT | 03.10.2002 | SE | 03.10.2002 | LU | 13.10.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/22] | FI | 03.07.2002 | |
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 03.07.2002 | |
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 03.07.2002 | |
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 03.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8909392 (COLE MARTIN TERENCE [AU]) [A] 1-18* figures 1,2 *; | [A] - GOODMAN D S, "METHOD FOR LOCALIZING LIGHT-SCATTERED PARTICLES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (198410), vol. 27, no. 5, page 3164, XP002066860 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * |