EP1027252 - COLLAPSIBLE BOTTLE WITH BELLOWS PORTION CARRYING A SHRINK LABEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/33] | COLLAPSIBLE BOTTLE WITH SHRINK LABEL | ||
[2000/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maelor Pharmaceuticals Limited Riversdale, Cae Gwilym Road, Newbridge Wrexham LL14 3JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Maelor Pharmaceuticals Limited Riversdale, Cae Gwilym Road Newbridge, Wrexham LL14 3JG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Graham, Stuart Sontley Cottage Sontley Road Wrexham LL13 7EN / GB | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Lord, Hilton David Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Lord, Hilton David MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98947690.8 | 16.10.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998GB03112 | Priority number, date | GB19970021969 | 16.10.1997 Original published format: GB 9721969 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9920534 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027252 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027252 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02, B65D23/08 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
B65D1/0292 (EP);
B65D23/0878 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENFALTBARE FLASCHE MIT MIT EINEM SCHRUMPFETIKETT BEDECKTER ZIEHHARMONIKAWAND | [2000/43] | English: | COLLAPSIBLE BOTTLE WITH BELLOWS PORTION CARRYING A SHRINK LABEL | [2000/43] | French: | BOUTEILLE COMPACTABLE AVEC SOUFFLET PORTANT UNE ETIQUETTE THERMORETRACTABLE | [2000/43] |
Former [2000/33] | ZUSAMMENFALTBARE FLASCHE MIT SCHRUMPFETIKETT | ||
Former [2000/33] | COLLAPSIBLE BOTTLE WITH SHRINK LABEL | ||
Former [2000/33] | BOUTEILLE COMPACTABLE AVEC ETIQUETTE THERMORETRACTABLE | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.05.2002 | BE | 08.05.2002 | CH | 08.05.2002 | FI | 08.05.2002 | FR | 08.05.2002 | GR | 08.05.2002 | LI | 08.05.2002 | NL | 08.05.2002 | DK | 08.08.2002 | PT | 08.08.2002 | SE | 08.08.2002 | IE | 16.10.2002 | LU | 16.10.2002 | CY | 31.10.2002 | ES | 28.11.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
FI | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
LU | 16.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.10.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
LU | 16.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.10.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.10.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
IE | 16.10.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 08.05.2002 | |
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 08.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0542946 ; | [A]JPH08230857 ; | [A]US4775564 (SHRIVER CLEM B [US], et al) [A] 3,4* column 2, line 12 - line 61; figures 1,5 *; | [Y]US4790361 (JONES DAVID T S [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-8 * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 20; figures 1,4 *; | [Y]WO9501912 (B & J MFG CO [US]) [Y] 1,2,5-8 * column 4, line 24 - column 7, line 16; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930629), vol. 017, no. 343, Database accession no. (M - 1436), & JP05042946 A 19930223 (HOUSE FOOD IND) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 097, no. 001, & JP08230857 A 19960910 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO) [A] 1 * abstract * |