EP1120612 - REFRIGERATING CYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zexel Valeo Climate Control Corporation 39, Aza Higashihara Oaza Sendai, Kohnan-machi Ohsato-gun, Saitama 360-0193 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Zexel Valeo Climate Control Corporation 39, Aza Higashihara, Oaza Sendai, Konan-machi Ohsato-gun, Saitama 360-0193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAI, Hiroshi Zexel Valeo Climate Control Co. 39, Aza Higashihara Oaza Sendai, Konan-machi Osato-gun Saitama 360-0193 / JP | 02 /
MUTA, Shunji Zexel Valeo Climate Control Co. 39, Aza Higashihara Oaza Sendai, Konan-machi Osato-gun Saitama 360-0193 / JP | 03 /
IIJIMA, Kenji Zexel Valeo Climate Control Co. 39, Aza Higashihara Oaza Sendai, Konan-machi Osato-gun Saitama 360-0193 / JP | 04 /
FURUYA, Shunichi Zexel Valeo Climate Control Co. 39, Aza Higashihara Oaza Sendai, Konan-machi Osato-gun Saitama 360-0193 / JP | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Kosmin, Gerald Emmanuel, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Kosmin, Gerald Emmanuel, et al Page Hargrave, Southgate, Whitefriars Lewins Mead, Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | Application number, filing date | 98947779.9 | 08.10.1998 | [2001/31] | WO1998JP04538 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020808 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1120612 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
F04C28/28 (EP,US);
F04C28/06 (EP,US);
F25B1/047 (EP,US);
F25B49/005 (EP,US);
F25B49/025 (EP,US);
F25B9/008 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2400/13 (EP,US);
F25B2600/025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/31] | Title | German: | KÄLTEKREISLAUF | [2001/31] | English: | REFRIGERATING CYCLE | [2001/31] | French: | CYCLE FRIGORIFIQUE | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2000 | Translation filed | 13.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 01.10.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4718442 (NICOLL HARRY G [US]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * * column 2, line 55 - line 61; figure 1 *; | [Y]US3633380 (PELLIZZETTI ITALO) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4841739 (WALLNER ROLF [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * * column 3, line 17 - line 20 *; | [A]US5694784 (FREY MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0837291 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]DE4427710 (AIR LIQUIDE GMBH [DE]) [A] * the whole document * | [A] - UNFALLVERHÜTUNGSVORSCHRIFT KÄLTEANLAGEN, WÄRMEPUMPEN UND KÜHLEINRICHTUNGEN, (199701), URL: www.unfallkassen.de/m_uvv/uvv2_5pdf, (20020730), XP002207955 [A] 1 * page 225 - page 28 * | International search | [A]JPH03503206 ; | [A]JPH07502335 |