Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03046128 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2003 | A3 | WO03046128 | 05.06.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US99043201 | 21.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001518623 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9819382 | 17.09.1998 | US93806197 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9489598 | Global Dossier | 23.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9819382 | 17.09.1998 | US93806197 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002343642 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2003 | A8 | AU2002343642 | 10.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99043201 | 21.11.2001 | US0235966 | 08.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1029243 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2002 | A4 | EP1029243 | 23.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9819382 | 17.09.1998 | US93806197 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2304555 | 08.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9819382 | 17.09.1998 | US93806197 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2001044121 | 22.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88714601 | 22.06.2001 | US93806197 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003044856 | 06.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66196400 | 14.09.2000 | US93806197 | 26.09.1997 | US99043201 | 21.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9917118 | Global Dossier | 08.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93806197 | 26.09.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6251611 | 26.06.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US93806197 | 26.09.1997 |