EP1029243 - A METHOD OF DETERMINING THE PRESENCE OF VOLUME DEPENDENT HYPERTENSION AND RELATED APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Administrators of The Tulane Educational Fund 1430 Tulane Avenue New Orleans, LA 70118-5679 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states THE ADMINISTRATORS OF THE TULANE EDUCATIONAL FUND 1430 Tulane Avenue New Orleans, LA 70118-5679 / US | ||
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states Tulane University Medical Center 1430 Tulane Avenue New Orleans, LA 70112-2699 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUSCHETT, Jules, B. 11 Muirfield Place New Orleans, LA 70131 / US | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98948298.9 | 17.09.1998 | [2000/34] | WO1998US19382 | Priority number, date | US19970938061 | 26.09.1997 Original published format: US 938061 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9917118 | Date: | 08.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1029243 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/68, C12Q1/48 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N2333/9121 (EP,US);
G01N2800/321 (EP,US);
Y10T436/105831 (EP,US);
Y10T436/106664 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/34] | G01N33/53, C12Q1/68, A01N33/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UM VOM VOLUMEN ABHÄNGIGE HYPERTENSION ZU BESTIMMEN UND ENTSPRECHENDE APPARATUR | [2000/34] | English: | A METHOD OF DETERMINING THE PRESENCE OF VOLUME DEPENDENT HYPERTENSION AND RELATED APPARATUS | [2000/34] | French: | METHODE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER L'EXISTENCE D'UNE HYPERTENSION VOLUME-DEPENDANTE, ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIE | [2000/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 02.01.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0628822 (ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 16 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - line 32 *; | [XY] - CHEN T C ET AL, "VOLUME EXPANSION-INDUCED CHANGES IN RENAL TUBULAR MEMBRANE PROTEIN PHOSPHORYLATION", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (1987), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 0085-2538, page 264, XP008009255 [X] 14,15,17-19 * abstract * [Y] 16 | [A] - LIPUT J ET AL, "INHIBITION BY VOLUME EXPANSION OF PHOSPHATE UPTAKE BY THE RENAL PROXIMAL TUBULE BRUSH BORDER MEMBRANE", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (1989), vol. 38, no. 2, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 321 - 326, XP008009377 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(89)90043-9 | [L] - DAMEN J E, "ERYTHROPOIETIN STIMULATES THE TYROSINE PHOSPHORYLATION OF SHC AND ITS ASSOCIATION WITH GRB2 AND A 145-KD TYROSINE PHOSPHORYLATED PROTEIN", BLOOD, W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, VA, US, (19931015), vol. 82, no. 8, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2296 - 2303, XP002035157 [L] 1-19 * the whole document * | [L] - GIBSON S ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION, CLONING, AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A NOVEL HUMAN T-CELL-SPECIFIC TYROSINE KINASE LOCATED AT THE HEMATOPOIETIN COMPLEX ON CHROMOSOME 5Q", BLOOD, W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, VA, US, (19930901), vol. 82, no. 5, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1561 - 1572, XP000611524 [L] 1-19 * the whole document * | International search | [YE]US5844091 (BLAUSTEIN MORDECAI P [US], et al); | [Y]US4840894 (SCHACHTER DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US4321120 (NARDI RONALD V, et al); | [A]US4665019 (HAMLYN JOHN M [US], et al); | [Y] - CHEN T C, ET AL., "VOLUME EXPANSION-INDUCED CHANGES IN RENAL TUBULAR MEMBRANE PROTEIN PHOSPHORYLATION", Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, US, (19870201), vol. 143, no. 01, doi:10.1016/0006-291X(87)90329-9, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 74 - 81, XP002916903 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(87)90329-9 | [Y] - PAMNANI M B, CLOUGH D L, HADDY F J, "ALTERED ACTIVITY OF THE SODIUM-POTASSIUM PUMP IN ASTERIES OF RATS WITH STEROID HYPERTENSION", CLINICAL SCIENCE AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, GB, (19780101), vol. 55, ISSN 0301-0538, pages 41S - 43S, XP002916904 | [Y] - NISHI A, BERTORELLO A M, APERIA A, "RENAL NA+, K+-ATPASE IN DAHL SALT-SENSITIVE RATS: K+ DEPENDENCE, EFFECT OF CELL ENVIRONMENT AND PROTEIN KINASES", ACTA PHYSIOLOGICA SCANDINAVICA, OXFORD, GB, GB, (19931101), vol. 149, no. 03, pages 377 - 384, XP002916905 | [A] - WEINMAN E J, SHENOLIKAR S, "PROTEIN KINASE C ACTIVATES THE RENAL APICAL MEMBRANE NA+/H+ EXCHANGER", Journal of Membrane Biology, Springer, XX, XX, (19860101), vol. 93, doi:10.1007/BF01870805, ISSN 0022-2631, pages 133 - 139, XP002916906 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01870805 |