EP1027341 - HIGH CHAR YIELD BENZOXAZINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EDISON POLYMER INNOVATION CORPORATION Suite 150, 4040 Embassy Parkway Akron, OH 44333 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Edison Polymer Innovation Corporation Suite 150, 4040 Embassy Parkway Akron, OH 44333 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDA, Hatsuo 2903 Weybridge Road Shaker Heights, OH 44120 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Fritzsche, Thomas, et al Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Fritzsche, Thomas M., Dr., et al Fuchs, Mehler, Weiss & Fritzsche Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98948431.6 | 22.09.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998US19799 | Priority number, date | US19970943989 | 03.10.1997 Original published format: US 943989 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918092 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027341 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D265/16 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
C07D265/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/33] | Title | German: | BENZOXAZINE MIT HOHEM KOHLENSTOFFGEHALT | [2000/33] | English: | HIGH CHAR YIELD BENZOXAZINES | [2000/33] | French: | BENZOXAZINES A PRODUCTION ELEVEE DE PRODUITS DE CARBONISATION | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5266695 (ISHIDA HATSUO [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9531447 (EDISON POLYMER INNOVATION [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0875531 (ADVANCED CERAMICS CORP [US]) [E] 1-7* claim 8 *; | [X] - G.P. MOLONEY ET AL., "Qualitative analysis of the stability of the oxazine ring of various benzoxazine and pyridooxazine derivatives with Proton Nuclear Magnetic Resonance Spectroscopy", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (199207), vol. 81, no. 7, pages 692 - 697, XP000941152 [X] 1-7 * see Table on page 693 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600810721 | International search | [X]US5543516 (ISHIDA HATSUO [US]) |