EP1019320 - NOVEL METHOD FOR MAKING MOLECULAR SIEVES AND NOVEL MOLECULAR SIEVE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB LUMMUS GLOBAL INC. 1515 Broad Street Bloomfield, New Jersey 07003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states ABB LUMMUS GLOBAL INC. 1515 Broad Street Bloomfield New Jersey 07003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURRELL, Lawrence, L. 1229 McDonough Street South Plainfield, NJ 07008 / US | 02 /
OVERBEEK, Rudolf, A. 32 Lexington Court Chatham, NJ 07928 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Yun-fen 25 Hickory Place E-10 Chatham, NJ 07928 / US | 04 /
VAN DER PUIL, Nelleke 805 Willow Avenue Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US | 05 /
YEH, Chuen, Y. 15 Stratford Circle Edison, NJ 08820 / US | [2000/36] |
Former [2000/35] | 01 /
MURRELL, Lawrence, L. 1229 McDonough Street South Plainfield, NJ 07008 / US | ||
02 /
OVERBEEK, Rudolf, A. 32 Lexington Court Chatham, NJ 07928 / US | |||
03 /
CHANG, Yun-fen 25 Hickory Place E-10 Chatham, NJ 07928 / US | |||
04 /
VAN DER PUIL, Nelleke 805 Wilow Avenue Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US | |||
05 /
YEH, Chuen, Y. 15 Stratford Circle Edison, NJ 08820 / US | |||
Former [2000/29] | 01 /
MURRELL, Lawrence, L. 1229 McDonough Street South Plainfield, NJ 07008 / US | ||
02 /
OVERBEEK, Rudolf, A. 32 Lexington Court Chatham, NJ 07928 / US | |||
03 /
CHANG, Yun-fen 25 Hickory Place E-10 Chatham, NJ 07928 / US | |||
04 /
VAN DER PUIL, Nelleke 305 Monroe Street Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US | |||
05 /
YEH, Chuen, Y. 15 Stratford Circle Edison, NJ 08820 / US | Representative(s) | Zellentin & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rubensstraße 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | Miller, Toivo ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 98948554.5 | 25.09.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998US20163 | Priority number, date | US19970939271 | 29.09.1997 Original published format: US 939271 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9916709 | Date: | 08.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019320 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C01B37/00, C01B37/02, C01B39/00, C01B39/24, C01B39/38, C01B39/46 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
B01J29/035 (EP,US);
B01J29/084 (EP,US);
B01J29/40 (EP,US);
B01J29/7007 (EP,US);
C01B37/00 (EP,US);
C01B37/02 (EP,US);
C01B39/00 (EP,US);
C01B39/24 (EP,US);
C01B39/38 (EP,US);
C01B39/46 (EP,US);
B01J2229/60 (EP,US);
B01J2229/64 (EP,US);
Y10S423/21 (EP,US);
Y10S423/22 (EP,US);
Y10S423/27 (EP,US);
Y10S423/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MOLEKULARSIEBEN UND MOLEKULARSIEBZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2000/29] | English: | NOVEL METHOD FOR MAKING MOLECULAR SIEVES AND NOVEL MOLECULAR SIEVE COMPOSITIONS | [2000/29] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE TAMIS MOLECULAIRES ET NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS DE TAMIS MOLECULAIRES | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 29.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2002 | Observations by third parties | 26.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2008/13] | 23.08.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.11.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/13] | Appeal following examination | 06.10.2004 | Appeal received No. T1441/04 | 17.12.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.11.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 22.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP07022511.5 / EP1894889 | Request for further processing for: | 27.02.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 27.02.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   05.11.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0137757 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-11,17,18,25-28,32,36,42-45 * claims 1,2 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 24 *; | [XA]EP0299430 (MONTEDIPE SPA [IT]) [X] 24,25,27,28,32,36,39-45 * claims 1,2,5,8 * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 43 * * example 1 * [A] 1-11,17,19,26; | [XA] - PADOVAN M. ET AL., "Study on titanium silicalite synthesis", STUDIES IN SURFACE SCIENCE AND CATALYSIS, (1991), vol. 63, pages 431 - 438, XP002090436 [X] 24,25,27,28,32,36,39-45 * the whole document * [A] 1-11,17,19,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-2991(08)64605-4 | [A] - POLAK FELIKS ET AL., "Applicability of silica gels for the synthesis of molecular sieves of the mordenite type", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19710322), vol. 74, no. 12, Database accession no. 57629, XP002090045 [A] * abstract * | [ ] - ZESZ. NAUK. UNIW. JAGIELLON., PR. CHEM., (1970), no. 15, pages 295 - 301 | [DA] - RAMESH B. BORADE ET AL., "Synthesis of zeolite Beta form a dense system containing a minimum of template", CATALYSIS LETTERS., BASEL CH, (1994), vol. 26, pages 285 - 289, XP002090437 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00810601 | other | US4235753 | US5558851 |