EP1035994 - HYDROFORMED SPACE FRAME AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cosma International Inc. 337 Magna Drive Aurora Ontario L4G 7K1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Cosma International Inc. 337 Magna Drive Aurora, Ontario L4G 7K1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAEKEL, Federico, G. 17 Deer Run Court Richmond Hill, Ontario L4E 3M1 / CA | 02 /
GABBIANELLI, Gianfranco 1667 Picadilly Troy, MI 48084 / US | 03 /
HORTON, Frank, A. 1993 Chalmers Drive Rochester Hills, MI 48309 / US | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Kovac, Werner MAGNA EUROPA AG Patentabteilung Magna-Strasse 1 2522 Oberwaltersdorf / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Kovac, Werner MAGNA EUROPA AG Patentabteilung Magna-Strasse 1 2522 Oberwaltersdorf / AT | ||
Former [2000/38] | Kovac, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Magna Europa AG, Patentabteilung, 2. Haidequerstrasse 3 1111 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 98948635.2 | 16.10.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998CA00962 | Priority number, date | US19970062204 | 16.10.1997 Original published format: US 62204 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9920516 | Date: | 29.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035994 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035994 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B62D23/00 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
B62D23/005 (EP,KR,US);
B23K2101/06 (EP,KR,US);
B60Y2304/074 (KR);
Y10T29/49622 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | DURCH INNENHOCHDRUCK GEFORMTES RAUMFACHWERK UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2000/38] | English: | HYDROFORMED SPACE FRAME AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2000/38] | French: | CAISSE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE HYDROFORMEE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 19.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Cited in | International search | [A]FR694774 (CARROSSERIE AUTOMOBILE FERNAND) [A] 7 * page 2, line 66 - line 73; figure 1 *; | [A]DE867059 (AUDI AG) [A] 1* page 2, line 35 - line 55; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2668722 (JOSEF MULLER) [Y] 1,10-13,18,22-24 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 8; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0570150 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 2 * column 2, line 8 - line 18; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9700595 (DANA CORP [US]) [Y] 1,10-13,18,22-24 * page 14, line 23 - page 16, line 3; figures 12-18 *; | [A]US5649735 (TOMFORDE JOHANN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 16 - line 49; figure 1 * |