EP1023505 - METHOD AND APPLICATION APPARATUS FOR ROAD MARKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIEBER & SOEN ASA P.B. 987, Noestegaten 58 5002 Bergen / NO | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINTERSKOV, Bo Elmevej 3 DK-5800 Nyborg / DK | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Larsen, Hans Ole, et al LARSEN & BIRKEHOLM A/S Skandinavisk Patentbureau Banegårdspladsen 1 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Larsen, Hans Ole, et al Larsen & Birkeholm A/S, Banegaardspladsen 1, P.O. Box 362 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 98948820.0 | 13.10.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998DK00446 | Priority number, date | DK19970001163 | 13.10.1997 Original published format: DK 116397 | [2000/31] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9922073 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023505 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023505 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E01C23/20 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
E01C23/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANBRINGEN VON FAHRWEGMARKIERUNGEN | [2000/31] | English: | METHOD AND APPLICATION APPARATUS FOR ROAD MARKING | [2000/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'APPLICATION UTILES POUR UN MARQUAGE DE ROUTES | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.1998 | Translation filed | 15.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 15.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 20.09.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 22.09.2004 | CY | 22.09.2004 | IT | 22.09.2004 | LI | 22.09.2004 | IE | 13.10.2004 | LU | 13.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | SE | 22.12.2004 | PT | 22.02.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | CH | 22.09.2004 | |
CY | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
LU | 13.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/25] | CH | 22.09.2004 | |
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | CH | 22.09.2004 | |
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | CH | 22.09.2004 | |
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | CH | 22.09.2004 | |
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 22.12.2004 | |
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 22.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4572703 (MOLLER JENS GERT K [DK]); | [Y]WO8601748 (WINTERSKOV BO); | [A]DE3728250 (GRUDE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP0422346 (WYSSBROD FERNANDO [CH]) |