EP1023371 - THERMOHARDENING PLASTIC MOULDING MATERIALS FOR MOULDED PARTS FOR DIRECT ELECTROPHORETIC COATING, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE MOULDED PARTS, AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raschig GmbH Mundenheimer Strasse 100 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | For all designated states Mas Engineering S.R.L. Via Tonale, 16 37100 Verona / IT | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNERSDORF, Reinert Völklingerstrasse 26 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
HEINRICH, Edmund An den Erlen 8 D-55257 Budenheim / DE | 03 /
CALEFFI, Erri Via Grazia Deledda, 10/A I-46027 S. Benedetto Po / IT | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Grussdorf, Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98948968.7 | 12.09.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998EP05818 | Priority number, date | DE1997142865 | 29.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19742865 | [2000/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9916820 | Date: | 08.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023371 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/04, H01B1/24, C25D13/00 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
C08L61/06 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08L61/28 (EP);
C08L61/34 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L61/06, C08L71/00 (EP);
C08L61/28, C08L71/00 (EP);
C08L61/34, C08L71/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | DUROPLASTISCHE FORMMASSEN FÜR FORMTEILE ZUR DIREKTEN ELEKTROPHORETISCHEN BESCHICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2000/31] | English: | THERMOHARDENING PLASTIC MOULDING MATERIALS FOR MOULDED PARTS FOR DIRECT ELECTROPHORETIC COATING, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE MOULDED PARTS, AND THEIR USE | [2000/31] | French: | MATIERES MOULABLES THERMODURCISSABLES POUR PIECES MOULEES DESTINEES A L'ENDUCTION ELECTROPHORETIQUE DIRECTE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 17.08.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]SU1627542 ; | [X]US4125496 (MCGINNIS STEPHEN B) [X] 1,2,5 * column 4; table II *; | [X]DE3935140 (BAYER AG) [X] 3,4,6-8 * claim 1 *; | [X]JPS60120758 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 43, Database accession no. 91-315985, XP002091692 & SU1627542 A 19910215 (METAL CORROSION PRO) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 32, Database accession no. 85-193509, XP002091693 & JPS60120758 A 19850628 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [X] 3,4,6-8 * abstract * |